Beecher et al v. Midship Pipeline Company LLC et al
Plaintiff: Gerald A Beecher and Lucy C Beecher
Defendant: Midship Pipeline Company LLC, Cheniere Energy Inc and Strike LLC
Case Number: 5:2021cv00569
Filed: June 4, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Bernard M Jones
Nature of Suit: Torts to Land
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 27, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 27, 2021 Filing 23 STIPULATION of Dismissal by All Plaintiffs. (Meyer, Henry)
July 23, 2021 Filing 22 STATUS REPORT by Plaintiffs Gerald A Beecher, Lucy C Beecher. (Meyer, Henry)
July 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER ~ The Court has been advised that certain claims in this matter may have settled and requests Plaintiff file a status report by July 23, 2021. Signed by Honorable Bernard M. Jones on 7/12/2021. (dwl)
June 22, 2021 Filing 20 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - LLC by Midship Pipeline Company LLC . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Zabel, Thomas)
June 17, 2021 Filing 19 ENTRY of Appearance by John A Krahl on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Krahl, John)
June 17, 2021 Filing 18 ENTRY of Appearance by Joseph K Goerke on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Goerke, Joseph)
June 17, 2021 Filing 17 ENTRY of Appearance by Henry A Meyer, III on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Meyer, Henry)
June 16, 2021 Filing 16 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - LLC by Strike LLC . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Rhonda Sigman)(Rounds, Philard)
June 16, 2021 Filing 15 ENTRY of Appearance by Charles D Neal, Jr on behalf of Strike LLC (Neal, Charles)
June 16, 2021 Filing 14 ENTRY of Appearance by Philard L Rounds, Jr on behalf of Strike LLC (Rounds, Philard)
June 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER ~ re #7 Disclosure Statement - LLC filed by Midship Pipeline Company LLC. Defendant's filing fails to identify the members of the LLC that is its sole member and is, therefore, STRICKEN. Defendant Midship Pipeline Company, LLC shall file an amended disclosure statement within 10 days of this Order. Defendants Cheniere Energy, Inc., and Strike, LLC are reminded of their obligations under Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 and LCvR7.1.1. Signed by Honorable Bernard M. Jones on 6/15/2021. (dwl)
June 11, 2021 Filing 12 ANSWER to Complaint by Midship Pipeline Company LLC.(Zabel, Thomas)
June 11, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE (other) by Cheniere Energy Inc Entry of Special Appearance (Bourenin, Vadim)
June 11, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE (other) by Cheniere Energy Inc Entry of Special Appearance (Zabel, Thomas)
June 11, 2021 Filing 9 ENTRY of Appearance by Mark Banner on behalf of Cheniere Energy Inc (Banner, Mark)
June 11, 2021 Filing 8 ENTRY of Appearance by D Kenyon Williams on behalf of Cheniere Energy Inc (Williams, D)
June 11, 2021 Filing 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - LLC by Midship Pipeline Company LLC . (Zabel, Thomas) *STRICKEN per Order #13 filed 6/15/2021.
June 11, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint by Cheniere Energy Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - Declaration of Sean Bunk)(Williams, D)
June 4, 2021 Filing 5 ENTRY of Appearance by Thomas A Zabel on behalf of Midship Pipeline Company LLC (Zabel, Thomas)
June 4, 2021 Filing 4 ENTRY of Appearance by Vadim O Bourenin on behalf of Midship Pipeline Company LLC (Bourenin, Vadim)
June 4, 2021 Filing 3 ENTRY of Appearance by D Kenyon Williams on behalf of Midship Pipeline Company LLC (Williams, D)
June 4, 2021 Filing 2 ENTRY of Appearance by Mark Banner on behalf of Midship Pipeline Company LLC (Banner, Mark)
June 4, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Kingfisher County District Court, case number CJ-2021-46 filed by Midship Pipeline Company LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Petition, #2 Exhibit 2 - Affidavit of Lindsay Robins, #3 Exhibit 3 - Declaration of Michael Revvin, #4 Exhibit 4 - Declaration of Rhonda M. Sigman, #5 Exhibit 5 - Defendant Strike, LLC's Consent to Removal, #6 Exhibit 6 - Defendant Cheniere Energy, Inc's Consent to Removal, #7 Exhibit 7 - Summons with Petition Issued to Midship Pipeline Company, LLC, #8 Exhibit 8 - Entry of Appearance of Henry A. Meyer, III, for Plaintiffs, #9 Exhibit 9 - Entry of Appearance Joseph K. Goerke for Plaintiffs, #10 Exhibit 10 - Entry of Appearance John A. Krahl for Plaintiffs, #11 Exhibit 11 - Summons Issued to Defendants, #12 Exhibit 12 - Return of Summons Issued to Midship Pipeline Company, LLC, #13 Exhibit 13 - Return of Summons Issued to Cheniere Energy, Inc, #14 Exhibit 14 - Return of Summons Issued to Strike, LLC, #15 Exhibit 15 - Proof of Service for Midship Pipeline Company, LLC, #16 Exhibit 16 - Proof of Service for Cheniere Energy, Inc, #17 Exhibit 17 - Proof of Service for Strike, LLC, #18 Exhibit 18 - Entry of Appearance for Charles D. Neal, Jr. for Strike LLC, #19 Exhibit 19 - Entry of Appearance for Philard L. Rounds, Jr. for Strike LLC, #20 Exhibit 20 - Answer of Defendant Strike, LLC, #21 Exhibit 21 - Special Entry of Appearance and Reservation of Time of D. Kenyon Williams and Mark Banner for Midship Pipeline Company, LLC and Cheniere Energy, Inc, #22 Exhibit 22 - Special Entry of Appearance and Reservation of Time of D. Kenyon Williams and Mark Banner for Cheniere Energy, Inc, #23 Exhibit 23 - Kingfisher County Court Docket, #24 Exhibit 24 - Index of Exhibits, #25 Exhibit 25 - List of Counsel, #26 Civil Cover Sheet)(knt)
June 4, 2021 PAYMENT FOR A CIVIL CASE Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AOKWDC-3697105. (Banner, Mark)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Beecher et al v. Midship Pipeline Company LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Midship Pipeline Company LLC
Represented By: Vadim O Bourenin
Represented By: D Kenyon Williams
Represented By: Thomas A Zabel
Represented By: Mark Banner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cheniere Energy Inc
Represented By: Vadim O Bourenin
Represented By: D Kenyon Williams
Represented By: Thomas A Zabel
Represented By: Mark Banner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Strike LLC
Represented By: Charles D Neal, Jr
Represented By: Philard L Rounds, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gerald A Beecher
Represented By: Henry A Meyer, III
Represented By: Joseph K Goerke
Represented By: John A Krahl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lucy C Beecher
Represented By: Henry A Meyer, III
Represented By: Joseph K Goerke
Represented By: John A Krahl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?