Soeda et al v. Storey
Plaintiff: Motoki Soeda
Defendant: John Patrick Storey
Case Number: 5:2021cv00639
Filed: June 22, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Bernard M Jones
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 9, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SCHEDULING ORDER: Pla expert witness list and expert reports due 1/5/2022; Dft expert witness list and expert reports due 1/20/2022; Pla witness list due 1/5/2022; Dft witness list due 1/20/2022; Pla exhibit list due 1/20/2022; Dft exhibit list due 2/5/2022; Motions in limine due 5/1/2022; Jury instructions due 5/1/2022; Voir dire requests due 5/1/2022; Trial briefs due 5/1/2022; Jury Trial set on the the Court's 6/2022 trial docket before Honorable Bernard M. Jones. Motions due by 2/1/2022. Pretrial Report due by 5/1/2022. Status/Scheduling Conference set for 9/2/2021 is hereby canceled. Signed by Honorable Bernard M. Jones on 8/9/2021. (dwl)
August 6, 2021 Filing 8 JOINT STATUS REPORT AND DISCOVERY PLAN by Plaintiffs Motoki Soeda, Motoki Soeda. (Campbell, Andy)
August 2, 2021 Filing 7 STATUS/SCHEDULING CONFERENCE DOCKET ~ Telephonic Status/Scheduling Conference set for 9/2/2021 10:00 AM before Honorable Bernard M. Jones. Status Report due by 8/23/2021. (dwl)
July 13, 2021 Filing 6 ENTRY of Appearance by Harris A Phillips, III on behalf of John Patrick Storey (Phillips, Harris)
July 13, 2021 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by John Patrick Storey.(Phillips, Harris)
June 22, 2021 Filing 4 ENTRY of Appearance by Glendell D Nix on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Nix, Glendell)
June 22, 2021 Filing 3 ENTRY of Appearance by Andy J Campbell on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Campbell, Andy)
June 22, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued Electronically as to John Patrick Storey. (knt)
June 22, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against John Patrick Storey filed by Motoki Soeda(Individually), Motoki Soeda(As Parent and Next Friend of K.S., a Minor). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(knt)
June 22, 2021 PAYMENT FOR A CIVIL CASE on behalf of Plaintiff Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AOKWDC-3707481. (Campbell, Andy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Soeda et al v. Storey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Patrick Storey
Represented By: Harris A Phillips, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Motoki Soeda
Represented By: Andy J Campbell
Represented By: Glendell D Nix
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?