Roberson v. Wal-Mart Inc et al
Plaintiff: Joann Roberson
Defendant: Wal-Mart Inc doing business as Sam's Club and Sam's East Inc doing business as Sam's Club
Case Number: 5:2021cv00657
Filed: June 28, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Patrick R Wyrick
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 3, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 SCHEDULING ORDER: Jury Trial set on the May 2022 trial docket (5/10/2022 09:00 AM) in Courtroom 503 before Honorable Patrick R Wyrick; Motions to join due 30 days from date of this order; Motions to amend due 30 days from date of this order; Pla expert witness list and expert reports due 3/1/2022; Dft expert witness list and expert reports due 3/11/2022; Pla witness list due 3/1/2022; Dft witness list due 3/11/2022; Pla exhibit list due 3/1/2022; Dft exhibit list due 3/11/2022; Motions in limine due 4/21/2021; Jury instructions due 4/21/2021; Voir dire requests due 4/21/2021; Trial briefs due 4/21/2021; Discovery due by 4/1/2022. Motions due by 3/1/2022. Pretrial Report due by 4/21/2022. Signed by Honorable Patrick R Wyrick on 8/3/2021. (ks)
July 16, 2021 Filing 15 ENTRY of Appearance by Harrison C Lujan on behalf of Joann Roberson (Lujan, Harrison)
July 16, 2021 Filing 14 ENTRY of Appearance by Peyton S Howell on behalf of Joann Roberson (Howell, Peyton)
July 16, 2021 Filing 13 ENTRY of Appearance by Chad W P Kelliher on behalf of Joann Roberson (Kelliher, Chad)
July 16, 2021 Filing 12 ENTRY of Appearance by Simone Fulmer Gaus on behalf of Joann Roberson (Gaus, Simone)
July 16, 2021 Filing 11 ENTRY of Appearance by Andrea R Rust on behalf of Joann Roberson (Rust, Andrea)
July 16, 2021 Filing 10 JOINT STATUS REPORT AND DISCOVERY PLAN by Plaintiff Joann Roberson. (Rowe, Jacob)
July 16, 2021 Filing 9 ENTRY of Appearance by Jacob L Rowe on behalf of Joann Roberson (Rowe, Jacob)
July 13, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Sam's East Inc, Wal-Mart Inc (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-Notice to State Court)(Brewer, Michael)
July 7, 2021 Filing 7 ENTRY of Appearance by Jeffrey D Scott on behalf of All Defendants (Scott, Jeffrey)
July 7, 2021 Filing 6 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by All Defendants . (Brewer, Michael)
July 7, 2021 Filing 5 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by All Defendants. (Brewer, Michael)
July 7, 2021 Filing 4 ENTRY of Appearance by Michael W Brewer on behalf of All Defendants (Brewer, Michael)
July 6, 2021 Filing 3 Receipt for Money Received from Wal-Mart Inc in the amount of $402, receipt number AOKWDC-3712290 regarding #1 Notice of Removal, (dtb)
July 6, 2021 Filing 2 AUGUST STATUS & SCHEDULING CONFERENCE DOCKET: Scheduling Conference set for 8/3/2021 01:20 PM in Chambers before Honorable Patrick R Wyrick. Status Report due by 7/27/2021. (ks)
June 28, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from The District Court of Oklahoma County, case number CJ-2021-2499 filed by Wal-Mart Inc, Sam's East Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1- Docket Sheet, #2 Exhibit 2- Petition, #3 Exhibit 3- Summons, #4 Exhibit 4- Answer to Petition, #5 Exhibit 5- Entry of Appearance, #6 Exhibit 6- Entry of Appearance, #7 Civil Cover Sheet)(dtb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Roberson v. Wal-Mart Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Inc doing business as Sam's Club
Represented By: Michael W Brewer
Represented By: Jeffrey D Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sam's East Inc doing business as Sam's Club
Represented By: Michael W Brewer
Represented By: Jeffrey D Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joann Roberson
Represented By: Chad W P Kelliher
Represented By: Andrea R Rust
Represented By: Peyton S Howell
Represented By: Jacob L Rowe
Represented By: Simone Fulmer Gaus
Represented By: Harrison C Lujan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?