Mehdipour et al v. C Craig Cole and Associates et al
Plaintiff: Faramarz Mehdipour and Ali Mehdipour
Defendant: C Craig Cole and Associates, Judge Cindy H Truong and April Collins
Case Number: 5:2021cv00684
Filed: July 7, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Patrick R Wyrick
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 7, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 27, 2021 Filing 12 RESPONSE in Opposition re #5 MOTION to Dismiss and Brief in Support filed by Ali Mehdipour, Faramarz Mehdipour. (dtb)
August 27, 2021 Filing 11 RESPONSE in Opposition re #5 MOTION to Dismiss and Brief in Support, #6 MOTION to Dismiss and Brief in Support filed by Ali Mehdipour, Faramarz Mehdipour. (dtb)
July 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 Motion for Extension of Time to File. The plaintiff is ordered to respond to #5 Motion to Dismiss and Brief in Support and #6 Motion to Dismiss, Renewed Motion to Dismiss and Brief in Support no later than 8/27/21. Signed by Honorable Patrick R Wyrick on 7/27/21. (dtb)
July 23, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION for Extension of Time by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1-Proposed Order)(dtb)
July 23, 2021 Filing 8 ENTRY of Appearance by Faramarz Mehdipour (dtb)
July 23, 2021 Filing 7 ENTRY of Appearance by Ali Mehdipour (dtb)
July 14, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss and Brief in Support by C Craig Cole and Associates. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Gatliff, John)
July 13, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss and Brief in Support by April Collins(individually ), April Collins(in his official capacity as Oklahoma County Special Judge), Cindy H Truong(individually ), Cindy H Truong(in her official capacity as Oklahoma County District Judge). (Lawson, Stefanie)
July 9, 2021 Filing 4 ENTRY of Appearance by C Craig Cole on behalf of C Craig Cole and Associates (Cole, C)
July 9, 2021 Filing 3 ENTRY of Appearance by John E Gatliff, II on behalf of C Craig Cole and Associates (Gatliff, John)
July 9, 2021 Filing 2 ENTRY of Appearance by Stefanie E Lawson on behalf of April Collins(individually ), April Collins(in his official capacity as Oklahoma County Special Judge), Cindy H Truong(individually ), Cindy H Truong(in her official capacity as Oklahoma County District Judge) (Lawson, Stefanie)
July 9, 2021 PAYMENT FOR A CIVIL CASE Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AOKWDC-3717913. (Lawson, Stefanie)
July 7, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from The District Court of Oklahoma County, case number CJ-2021-1569 filed by April Collins(individually ), Cindy H Truong(individually ), April Collins(in his official capacity as Oklahoma County Special Judge), Cindy H Truong(in her official capacity as Oklahoma County District Judge). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1- Amended Petition, #2 Exhibit 2- Summons, #3 Exhibit 3- State Docket Sheet, #4 Exhibit 4- State Pleadings, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(dtb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mehdipour et al v. C Craig Cole and Associates et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Faramarz Mehdipour
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ali Mehdipour
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C Craig Cole and Associates
Represented By: John E Gatliff, II
Represented By: C Craig Cole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Judge Cindy H Truong
Represented By: Stefanie E Lawson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: April Collins
Represented By: Stefanie E Lawson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?