Winkler et al v. Saexploration Seismic Services LLC et al
Plaintiff: Dustin Winkler and Jodi Winkler
Defendant: Saexploration Seismic Services LLC and Francisco Javier Garcia
Case Number: 5:2021cv00730
Filed: July 22, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Jodi W Dishman
Referring Judge: Stephen P Friot
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 9, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 9, 2021 Filing 13 TELEPHONIC STATUS/SCHEDULING CONFERENCE DOCKET: Scheduling Conference set for 10/7/2021 09:45 AM before Honorable Stephen P. Friot. Status Report due by 10/4/2021. (llg)
August 11, 2021 Filing 12 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Saexploration Seismic Services LLC . (Thul, Ashley)
August 3, 2021 Filing 11 SUPPLEMENT Notice of Removal by Francisco Javier Garcia, Saexploration Seismic Services LLC. (Thul, Ashley)
July 30, 2021 Filing 10 EMAIL from Courtroom Deputy Lori Gray to Oklahoma State Attorney General. (llg)
July 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER re #8 Notice of Constitutional Question filed by Saexploration Seismic Services LLC, Francisco Javier Garcia. If he wishes to do so, the Okla State Attorney General is granted leave to intervene in this action, within 60 days of the date of this order, for purposes of presenting evidence & argument on the constitutional challenge raised by dfts. The clerk is DIRECTED to provide the State AG with a copy of this order, a copy of dfts' notice of constitutional question (w/attached answers), & a copy of the court's docket sheet in this action as it now stands. The clerk shall file the transmission email. Signed by Honorable Stephen P. Friot on 7/30/2021. (llg)
July 29, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE (other) by Francisco Javier Garcia, Saexploration Seismic Services LLC of Constitutional Question (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Answer of SAExploration, #2 Exhibit 2 - Answer of Garcia)(Thul, Ashley)
July 29, 2021 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Francisco Javier Garcia.(Thul, Ashley)
July 29, 2021 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Saexploration Seismic Services LLC.(Thul, Ashley)
July 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER re #1 Notice of Removal filed by Saexploration Seismic Services LLC, Francisco Javier Garcia. Dfts are DIRECTED to file, within 7 days of the date of this order, a supplement to the notice of removal which provides all of the missing jurisdictional information (as fully set out in this order). Signed by Honorable Stephen P. Friot on 7/27/2021. (llg)
July 26, 2021 Filing 4 ENTER ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Honorable Stephen P. Friot for all further proceedings. Honorable Jodi W. Dishman no longer assigned to case. HEREAFTER, PLEASE REFER TO CASE AS: CIV-21-00730-F. Entered at the direction of the Honorable Jodi W. Dishman on 07/26/2021. (nv)
July 22, 2021 Filing 3 ENTRY of Appearance by Monty B Bottom on behalf of Francisco Javier Garcia, Saexploration Seismic Services LLC (Bottom, Monty)
July 22, 2021 Filing 2 ENTRY of Appearance by Ashley M Thul on behalf of Francisco Javier Garcia, Saexploration Seismic Services LLC (Thul, Ashley)
July 22, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Garfield County District Court, case number 2021-134 filed by Francisco Javier Garcia, Saexploration Seismic Services LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Petition 06-29-21, #2 Exhibit 2 - Summons - Garcia, #3 Exhibit 3 - Return of Service - Garcia, #4 Exhibit 4 - Summons - SAE, #5 Exhibit 5 - Return of Service - SAE, #6 Exhibit 6 - OSCN Case Details 7.21.21, #7 Civil Cover Sheet)(knt)
July 22, 2021 PAYMENT FOR A CIVIL CASE Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AOKWDC-3727365. (Thul, Ashley)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Winkler et al v. Saexploration Seismic Services LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dustin Winkler
Represented By: Clint A Claypole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jodi Winkler
Represented By: Clint A Claypole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Saexploration Seismic Services LLC
Represented By: Ashley M Thul
Represented By: Monty B Bottom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Francisco Javier Garcia
Represented By: Ashley M Thul
Represented By: Monty B Bottom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?