Shakur v. City of Moore Oklahoma et al
Plaintiff: Malik Shakur
Defendant: City of Moore Oklahoma, City of Moore Police Department, City of Moore Department of Human Services and City of Moore Department of Human Sevices
Case Number: 5:2021cv00758
Filed: July 30, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Bernard M Jones
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 21, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER ~ Granting #12 Plaintiff's Motion to Alter and Amend Styling of Case. Amended complaint must be filed no later than October 8, 2021. Signed by Honorable Bernard M. Jones on 9/21/2021. (dwl)
September 21, 2021 Filing 12 MOTION to Amend/Correct titled "Motion to Alter and Amend Styling of Case for Misjoinder and Nonjoinder of Parties" by Malik Shakur. (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1 - Rule 21. Misjoinder and Nonjoinder of Parties, #2 Attachment 2 - Proposed Amended Complaint)(knt)
September 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER ~ Granting #6 Motion to Dismiss. All claims against the City of Moore Police Department are dismissed with prejudice, and all claims against the City of Moore are dismissed without prejudice. Plaintiff shall have 21 days from the date of this Order to file an amended complaint, but only with respect to claims against the City of Moore. Should Plaintiff not file an amended complaint, judgment will enter dismissing the matter without prejudice. Signed by Honorable Bernard M. Jones on 9/17/2021. (dwl)
September 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER ~ Granting #4 Motion to Dismiss. All claims against Defendants Shanna Wood and Charles M. Jackson are dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Honorable Bernard M. Jones on 9/17/2021. (dwl)
September 7, 2021 Filing 9 REPLY to Response to Motion re #6 MOTION to Dismiss filed by City of Moore Oklahoma, City of Moore Police Department. (Nice, R)
August 31, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE (other) titled "Petition in Error for Fraud on the Court - Court Clerk's Altering of Document" by Malik Shakur (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1 - Affidavit of Fact and Law, #2 Exhibit 1 - Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit 2 - First Page of Complaint)(knt)
August 26, 2021 Filing 7 ENTRY of Appearance by Dane H Miller on behalf of City of Moore Oklahoma, City of Moore Police Department (Miller, Dane)
August 26, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss by City of Moore Oklahoma, City of Moore Police Department. (Nice, R)
August 26, 2021 Filing 5 ENTRY of Appearance by R Blaine Nice on behalf of City of Moore Oklahoma, City of Moore Police Department (Nice, R)
August 20, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION to Dismiss , MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by City of Moore Department of Human Services, City of Moore Department of Human Sevices. (Langford, John)
August 20, 2021 Filing 3 ENTRY of Appearance by John K F Langford on behalf of City of Moore Department of Human Services, City of Moore Department of Human Sevices (Langford, John)
July 30, 2021 Filing 2 Receipt for Money Received from Malik Shakur in the amount of $402.00, receipt number OKW500086531 regarding #1 Complaint. Receipt provided to plaintiff at Court Clerk's Office. (knt)
July 30, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against City of Moore Department of Human Services, City of Moore Department of Human Sevices, City of Moore Oklahoma, City of Moore Police Department filed by Malik Shakur. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Excerpts from Oklahoma Constitution, #2 Exhibit 2 - Oklahoma Policde Oath of Office, #3 Exhibit 3 - Excerpts from Oklahoma City Police Department Operations Manual, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(knt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shakur v. City of Moore Oklahoma et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Malik Shakur
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Moore Oklahoma
Represented By: Dane H Miller
Represented By: R Blaine Nice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Moore Police Department
Represented By: Dane H Miller
Represented By: R Blaine Nice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Moore Department of Human Services
Represented By: John K F Langford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Moore Department of Human Sevices
Represented By: John K F Langford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?