Pair et al v. Postal Fleet Services Inc et al
Plaintiff: Joshua Pair
Defendant: Postal Fleet Services Inc, The Stageline Company, Vilano Employment Services Inc, Don Dorris, Leslie Dorris and Brenda Dorris
Case Number: 5:2021cv00759
Filed: July 30, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Robin J Cauthron
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 27, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 27, 2021 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Defendant Vilano Employment Services Inc. Vilano Employment Services Inc waiver sent on 9/24/2021, answer due 11/23/2021. (Federman, William)
September 27, 2021 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Defendant The Stageline Company. The Stageline Company waiver sent on 9/24/2021, answer due 11/23/2021. (Federman, William)
September 27, 2021 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Defendant Postal Fleet Services Inc. Postal Fleet Services Inc waiver sent on 9/24/2021, answer due 11/23/2021. (Federman, William)
September 22, 2021 Filing 4 ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Executed as to #2 Summons Issued of Service of Complaint Upon Postal Fleet Services, Inc. Acknowledgement filed by Plaintiff Joshua Pair. (Federman, William)
September 14, 2021 Filing 3 ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Executed Acknowledgement filed by Plaintiffs Joshua Pair, Joshua Pair. (Federman, William)
August 3, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued Electronically as to Postal Fleet Services Inc. (kah)
August 2, 2021 PAYMENT FOR A CIVIL CASE Pair et al v. Postal Fleet Services Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AOKWDC-3732613. (Federman, William)
July 30, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Brenda Dorris, Don Dorris, Leslie Dorris, Postal Fleet Services Inc, The Stageline Company, Vilano Employment Services Inc filed by Joshua Pair(individually), Joshua Pair(on behalf of all others similarly situated). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Consent to Become a Party Plaintiff, #2 Exhibit 2 - Email from Postal Fleet Services, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(kah)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pair et al v. Postal Fleet Services Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joshua Pair
Represented By: Molly E Brantley
Represented By: William B Federman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Postal Fleet Services Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Stageline Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vilano Employment Services Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Don Dorris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leslie Dorris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brenda Dorris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?