Rigsby v. Great State of Arkansas et al
Plaintiff: Dennis Ray Rigsby, Jr
Defendant: Great State of Arkansas, Parker and Great State of Oklahoma
Case Number: 5:2021cv00760
Filed: July 30, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Charles Goodwin
Referring Judge: David L Russell
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 28, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 JUDGMENT In accordance with the Courts Order entered this date, Plaintiffs Complaint is dismissed. Signed by Judge David L. Russell on 9/28/21. (jw)
September 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION #6 The Report and Recommendation is ADOPTED and the Complaint is DISMISSED without PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge David L. Russell on 9/28/21. (jw)
September 15, 2021 Filing 12 ENTER ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Honorable David L. Russell for all further proceedings. Signed by the direction of Honorable Charles Goodwin on 09/15/2021. (jb) (Main Document 12 replaced on 9/15/2021 to correct document) (jb).
September 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Honorable Charles Goodwin recused. Signed by Honorable Charles Goodwin on 09/15/2021. (jb)
September 9, 2021 Filing 10 MOTION for Order titled, "Motion to present Truths in above case number" by Dennis Ray Rigsby, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1 - Letter to Boone County Clerk, #2 Attachment 2 - Notice to Court Clerk, #3 Envelope)(kmt)
August 25, 2021 Filing 9 LETTER from Dennis Rigsby Jr (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (jjs)
August 19, 2021 Filing 8 LETTER from Dennis Ray Rigsby Junior (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (kmt)
August 18, 2021 Filing 7 OBJECTION TO REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION #6 filed by Dennis Ray Rigsby, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(kmt)
August 4, 2021 Filing 6 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION - It is recommended that Plaintiffs action Doc #1 re Complaint be dismissed without prejudice. Objections to R&R due by 8/24/2021. This Report and Recommendation disposes of all issues referred to the undersigned Magistrate Judge in the captioned matter. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gary M. Purcell on 8/4/2021. (cps)
August 4, 2021 Magistrate Judge Gary M. Purcell no longer assigned to case. (cps)
August 3, 2021 Filing 5 ENTER ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Gary M. Purcell. Motions referred to Gary M. Purcell.. Signed at the direction of The Honorable Charles Goodwin on 8/3/21. (dtb)
August 3, 2021 Filing 4 ENTER ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Honorable Charles Goodwin for all further proceedings. Honorable Patrick R Wyrick no longer assigned to case. Signed at the direction of The Honorable Patrick R Wyrick on 8/3/21. (dtb)
August 3, 2021 Filing 3 PREVIOUS Cases (dtb)
July 30, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Dennis Ray Rigsby, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1- Account Money Receipts)(dtb)
July 30, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Dennis Ray Rigsby, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(dtb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rigsby v. Great State of Arkansas et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dennis Ray Rigsby, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Great State of Arkansas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Parker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Great State of Oklahoma
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?