Mighty Siren LLC et al v. Bates et al
Plaintiff: Mighty Siren LLC, Redbud2020, Ledger Gypsy LLC, Lisa Davis, Sylvia Tomlinson and Amber Jones
Defendant: Brent Bates, Andrew Taylor and Sensible Wellness
Case Number: 5:2021cv00788
Filed: August 11, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: David L Russell
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 29, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 29, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Change of Address by Roe T Simmons (Simmons, Roe)
September 28, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Brent Bates. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration)(Wood, Scott)
September 28, 2021 Filing 3 ENTRY of Appearance by Scott B Wood on behalf of Brent Bates (Wood, Scott)
September 14, 2021 Filing 2 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Amber Jones, Redbud2020, Lisa Davis, Mighty Siren LLC, Ledger Gypsy LLC. Brent Bates served on 9/8/2021. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Officer Return)(Simmons, Roe)
August 11, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Brent Bates, Sensible Wellness, Andrew Taylor filed by Amber Jones, Redbud2020, Lisa Davis, Sylvia Tomlinson, Mighty Siren LLC, Ledger Gypsy LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(kah)
August 11, 2021 PAYMENT FOR A CIVIL CASE Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AOKWDC-3739540. (Simmons, Roe)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mighty Siren LLC et al v. Bates et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mighty Siren LLC
Represented By: Roe T Simmons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Redbud2020
Represented By: Roe T Simmons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ledger Gypsy LLC
Represented By: Roe T Simmons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa Davis
Represented By: Roe T Simmons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sylvia Tomlinson
Represented By: Roe T Simmons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amber Jones
Represented By: Roe T Simmons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brent Bates
Represented By: Scott B Wood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sensible Wellness
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?