Folsom v. Internal Revenue Services et al
Plaintiff: Glen Folsom
Defendant: Internal Revenue Services, North Fork Correctional Facility, Rick Whitten, FNU LNU, Steven Harpe and Social Security Office
Case Number: 5:2021cv00789
Filed: August 10, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Timothy D DeGiusti
Referring Judge: Shon T Erwin
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 2, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 5, 2021 Filing 14 MOTION for Order titled, "Motion for Access to Your Court" by Glen Folsom. Motions referred to Shon T. Erwin. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(kmt)
October 5, 2021 Filing 13 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Glen Folsom. Motions referred to Shon T. Erwin. (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1 - Account History, #2 Attachment 2 - Order, #3 Envelope)(kmt)
October 4, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE (other) by Glen Folsom (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(kmt)
September 20, 2021 Filing 11 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Glen Folsom. Motions referred to Shon T. Erwin. (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1 - Financial Statements, #2 Attachment 2 - Letter, #3 Envelope)(kmt)
September 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER -- On August 12, 2021, the Court directed Plaintiff to cure deficiencies in his pleadings. See ECF No. 7. The Court is now in receipt of additional documents Plaintiff tendered in the above-referenced matter. However, the documents remain deficient in the area(s) indicated. Plaintiff shall cure the deficiencies designated no later than October 7, 2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shon T. Erwin on 9/20/2021. (mc)
September 14, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION for Order titled, "Motion on Termination of Judgments and to Re File on all cases" by Glen Folsom. Motions referred to Shon T. Erwin. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(kmt)
September 14, 2021 Filing 8 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Internal Revenue Services(In official capacity), Internal Revenue Services(Individually), FNU LNU, North Fork Correctional Facility, Rick Whitten(In official capacity, Warden), Rick Whitten(Individually), Steven Harpe, Steven Harpe, Social Security Office filed by Glen Folsom. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Envelope)(kmt)
August 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER re #3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Glen Folsom -- The Court is in receipt of the documents Plaintiff tendered in this matter. However, the documents are deficient in the area(s) as indicated. Plaintiff shall cure the deficiencies designated no later than August 30, 2021. See Order as more fully set out. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shon T. Erwin on 8/12/2021. (mc)
August 11, 2021 Filing 6 ENTER ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Shon T. Erwin. Motions referred to Shon T. Erwin. Signed by the direction of Honorable Timothy D. DeGiusti on 8/11/2021. (kmt)
August 11, 2021 Filing 5 ENTER ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Honorable Timothy D. DeGiusti for all further proceedings. Honorable Bernard M. Jones no longer assigned to case. Signed by the direction of Honorable Bernard M. Jones on 8/11/2021. (kmt)
August 11, 2021 Filing 4 PREVIOUS Cases (kmt)
August 11, 2021 Notice of Mailing LCvR5.4/Change of Address form, #1 , #5 , #6 to: Glen Folsom#172239LAWTON-LCF8607 SE Flower Mound RdLawton, OK 73501 (kmt)
August 10, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Glen Folsom. (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1 - Inmate Request, #2 Envelope)(kmt)
August 10, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE by Glen Folsom (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(kmt)
August 10, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Internal Revenue Services(In official capacity), Internal Revenue Services(Individually), FNU LNU, North Fork Correctional Facility, Rick Whitten(In official capacity, Warden), Rick Whitten(Individually) filed by Glen Folsom. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(kmt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Folsom v. Internal Revenue Services et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Glen Folsom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Internal Revenue Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: North Fork Correctional Facility
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rick Whitten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FNU LNU
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven Harpe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Office
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?