Folsom v. Pottawatomie County Courthouse et al
Plaintiff: Glen Folsom
Defendant: Pottawatomie County Courthouse, Beckham County Court, Oklahoma Court of Criminal Appeals, 10th Circuit Courts, Oklahoma Supreme Court, Western District of Oklahoma, Oklahoma State of, Kevin Stitt, FNU LNU and Rick Whitten
Case Number: 5:2021cv00791
Filed: August 10, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Timothy D DeGiusti
Referring Judge: Shon T Erwin
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 2, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 5, 2021 Filing 16 MOTION for Order titled, "Motion for Access to Your Court" by Glen Folsom. Motions referred to Shon T. Erwin. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(kmt)
October 5, 2021 Filing 15 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Glen Folsom. Motions referred to Shon T. Erwin. (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1 - Offender Statement Report, #2 Attachment 2 - Order, #3 Envelope)(kmt)
October 4, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE (other) by Glen Folsom (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(kmt)
September 20, 2021 Filing 13 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Glen Folsom. Motions referred to Shon T. Erwin. (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1 - Financial Statements, #2 Attachment 2 - Letter, #3 Envelope)(kmt)
September 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 SECOND ORDER TO PLAINTIFF TO CURE DEFICIENCIES -- On August 12, 2021, the Court directed Plaintiff to cure deficiencies in his pleadings. This Order was returned. See ECF No. 7 and 8. The Court is now in receipt of additional documents Plaintiff tendered in this matter. However, the documents remain deficient in the area(s) indicated. Plaintiff shall cure the deficiencies designated above no later than October 7, 2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shon T. Erwin on 9/20/20201. (mc)
September 14, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE by Glen Folsom titled, "RE Glen Earl Folsom case all under In forma pauperis Affidavit of Glen Earl Folsom 9-12-21 at Lawton Corr. Fac. on Filing In forma pauperis in all his case" re #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1 - Account Statement, #2 Envelope)(kmt)
September 14, 2021 Filing 10 MOTION for Order titled, "Motion on Termination of Judgments and to Re-File on all cases" by Glen Folsom. Motions referred to Shon T. Erwin. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(kmt)
September 14, 2021 Filing 9 AMENDED COMPLAINT against 10th Circuit Courts(In official capacity), 10th Circuit Courts(Individually), Beckham County Court(Individually), Beckham County Court(In official capacity, Sayre), Oklahoma Court of Criminal Appeals(In official capacity), Oklahoma Court of Criminal Appeals(Individually), Oklahoma Supreme Court(In official capacity), Oklahoma Supreme Court(Individually), Western District of Oklahoma(In official capacity), Western District of Oklahoma(Individually), FNU LNU, FNU LNU, FNU LNU, Rick Whitten, Rick Whitten filed by Glen Folsom. (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1 - Supreme Court of Oklahoma, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Envelope)(kmt)
August 27, 2021 Filing 8 Mail Returned as Undeliverable re #7 Order,, as to Glen Folsom and IFP form. (kmt)
August 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER re #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Glen Folsom -- The Court is in receipt of the documents Plaintiff tendered in this matter. However, the documents are deficient in the area(s) as indicated. Plaintiff shall cure the deficiencies designated no later than August 30, 2021. See Order as more fully set out. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shon T. Erwin on 8/12/2021. (mc)
August 11, 2021 Filing 6 ENTER ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Shon T. Erwin. Motions referred to Shon T. Erwin. Signed by the direction of Honorable Timothy D. DeGiusti on 8/11/2021. (kmt)
August 11, 2021 Filing 5 ENTER ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Honorable Timothy D. DeGiusti for all further proceedings. Honorable Jodi W. Dishman no longer assigned to case. Signed by the direction of Honorable Jodi W. Dishman on 8/11/2021. (kmt)
August 11, 2021 Filing 4 PREVIOUS Cases (kmt)
August 11, 2021 Notice of Mailing LCvR5.4/Change of Address form, #1 , #5 , #6 to: Glen Folsom#172239LAWTON-LCF8607 SE Flower Mound RdLawton, OK 73501 (kmt)
August 10, 2021 Filing 3 PRO SE LITIGANT'S REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF 6 SUMMONS(ES) by Glen Folsom. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(kmt)
August 10, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Glen Folsom. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(kmt)
August 10, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against 10th Circuit Courts(In official capacity), 10th Circuit Courts(Individually), Beckham County Court(Individually), Beckham County Court(In official capacity, Sayre), Kevin Stitt, Oklahoma Court of Criminal Appeals(Individually), Oklahoma Court of Criminal Appeals(In official capacity), Oklahoma State of(In official capacity), Oklahoma State of(Individually), Oklahoma Supreme Court(In official capacity), Oklahoma Supreme Court(Individually), Pottawatomie County Courthouse(In official capacity, Shawnee and McAlester), Pottawatomie County Courthouse(Individually), Western District of Oklahoma(Individually), Western District of Oklahoma(In official capacity) filed by Glen Folsom. (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1 - Grievance Decision from Reviewing Authority, #2 Envelope)(kmt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Folsom v. Pottawatomie County Courthouse et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Glen Folsom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pottawatomie County Courthouse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Beckham County Court
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oklahoma Court of Criminal Appeals
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 10th Circuit Courts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oklahoma Supreme Court
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Western District of Oklahoma
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oklahoma State of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin Stitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FNU LNU
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rick Whitten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?