Blain v. Jenkins et al
Plaintiff: Matthew R Blain
Defendant: Jackie Jenkins and Tony Snowden
Case Number: 5:2021cv00824
Filed: August 20, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Amanda Maxfield Green
Referring Judge: Patrick R Wyrick
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 15, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER to Agency Having Custody of Plaintiff for Payment of Inmate Filing Fee. Signed by Magistrate Judge Amanda Maxfield Green on 10/15/2021. (rb)
October 12, 2021 Filing 8 Receipt for Money Received from Matthew R Blain in the amount of $15, receipt number OKW500087556 regarding #1 Complaint. Remaining balance 335. Receipt mailed to Matthew R BlainTAFT-JDCCP O Box 316Taft, OK 74463-0316 and 31411 E County rd 1485 Mangum, OK 73554 (dtb)
September 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that on or before October 20, 2021, Plaintiff pay an initial partial filing fee of $15.00. Signed by Magistrate Judge Amanda Maxfield Green on 9/29/2021. (rb)
September 27, 2021 Filing 6 AMENDED MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Matthew R Blain. Motions referred to Amanda Maxfield Green. (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1- Offender Statement Report, #2 Envelope)(dtb)
September 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER to Cure Deficiencies. Signed by Magistrate Judge Amanda Maxfield Green on 9/16/2021. (rb)
August 24, 2021 Filing 4 ENTER ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Amanda Maxfield Green. Motions referred to Amanda Maxfield Green.. Signed at the direction of The Honorable Patrick R Wyrick on 8/24/21. (dtb)
August 24, 2021 Filing 3 NO PREVIOUS Cases (dtb)
August 20, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Matthew R Blain. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(dtb)
August 20, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Jackie Jenkins, Tony Snowden filed by Matthew R Blain. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(dtb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Blain v. Jenkins et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew R Blain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jackie Jenkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tony Snowden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?