Harding v. Oklahoma Department of Corrections et al
Plaintiff: William L Harding
Defendant: Oklahoma Department of Corrections, Joseph Harp Furniture Factory, Alex Lunn, Keith Wells and Anthony Weichech
Case Number: 5:2021cv00842
Filed: August 25, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Jodi W Dishman
Referring Judge: Gary M Purcell
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 21, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 21, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave of Court to File Documents in Camera by Joseph Harp Furniture Factory, Alex Lunn, Oklahoma Department of Corrections, Keith Wells. Motions referred to Gary M. Purcell. (Clayton, Jacqueline)
August 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REQUIRING SPECIAL REPORT. See Order further details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gary M. Purcell on 8/27/2021. (cps)
August 26, 2021 Filing 5 ENTRY of Appearance by Jacqueline R Clayton on behalf of Joseph Harp Furniture Factory, Alex Lunn, Oklahoma Department of Corrections, Keith Wells (Clayton, Jacqueline)
August 26, 2021 PAYMENT FOR A CIVIL CASE Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AOKWDC-3748761. (Clayton, Jacqueline)
August 25, 2021 Filing 4 ENTER ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Gary M. Purcell. Signed by the direction of Honorable Jodi W. Dishman on 08/25/2021. (jjs)
August 25, 2021 Filing 3 ENTER ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Honorable Jodi W. Dishman for all further proceedings. Honorable Joe Heaton no longer assigned to case. Signed by the direction of Honorable Joe Heaton on 08/25/2021. (jjs)
August 25, 2021 Filing 2 PREVIOUS Cases (jjs)
August 25, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from District Court of Cleveland County, case number CJ-21-487 filed by Keith Wells, Alex Lunn, Joseph Harp Furniture Factory, Oklahoma Department of Corrections. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Petition, #2 Exhibit 2 - OSCN Case Details-Harding, #3 Exhibit 3 - IFP, #4 Exhibit 4 - CCS for 5 Defs, #5 Exhibit 5 - CCS, #6 Exhibit 6 - COS to Habas, #7 Exhibit 7 - EOA- Plntf, #8 Exhibit 8 - Change of Address, #9 Exhibit 9 - Motion to Appt Counsel, #10 Exhibit 10 - Ltr frm Plntf, #11 Exhibit 11 - Summary Ord, #12 Exhibit 12 - Summons, #13 Civil Cover Sheet)(jjs)
August 25, 2021 Notice of Mailing LCvR5.4/Change of Address form and #1 Notice of Removal, #3 Enter Order and #4 Enter Order to William L Harding #234-134 SAYRE-NFCC E-N-149 1605 E Main Sayre, OK 73662 (jjs)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Harding v. Oklahoma Department of Corrections et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William L Harding
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oklahoma Department of Corrections
Represented By: Jacqueline R Clayton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Harp Furniture Factory
Represented By: Jacqueline R Clayton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alex Lunn
Represented By: Jacqueline R Clayton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keith Wells
Represented By: Jacqueline R Clayton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthony Weichech
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?