Waters et al v. City of Altus, Oklahoma et al
Plaintiff: Bradley Waters and Bryan Waters
Defendant: Altus City of, FNU LNU, Sheriff Roger Levick, Thomas Hobbs, Jacob Parsons and Jennifer L Hazlewood
Case Number: 5:2021cv00865
Filed: August 31, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Joe Heaton
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 29, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 29, 2021 Filing 21 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Bradley Waters, Bryan Waters.(Smolen, Daniel)
October 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #19 plaintiff's unopposed motion for extension of deadline....plaintiff shall file his response to defendant Hazlewood's motion to dismiss #17 not later than 10/29/2021. Signed by Judge Joe Heaton on 10/26/2021. (lam)
October 21, 2021 Filing 19 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #17 MOTION to Dismiss by All Plaintiffs. (Smolen, Daniel)
October 6, 2021 Filing 18 NOTICE (other) by Roger Levick Party Name Correction (Moon, William)
October 1, 2021 Filing 17 MOTION to Dismiss by Jennifer L Hazlewood. (Winter, Anthony)
October 1, 2021 Filing 16 ENTRY of Appearance by Anthony C Winter on behalf of Jennifer L Hazlewood (Winter, Anthony)
September 27, 2021 Filing 15 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Altus City of.(Janzen, Eric)
September 27, 2021 Filing 14 ENTRY of Appearance by William R Moon, Jr on behalf of Roger Levick (Moon, William)
September 27, 2021 Filing 13 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Roger Levick.(Artus, Andrew)
September 27, 2021 Filing 12 ENTRY of Appearance by Andrew A Artus on behalf of Roger Levick (Artus, Andrew)
September 24, 2021 Filing 11 ENTRY of Appearance by Sean M McKelvey on behalf of Altus City of, Thomas Hobbs, Jacob Parsons (McKelvey, Sean)
September 24, 2021 Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint by Thomas Hobbs, Jacob Parsons.(Janzen, Eric)
September 24, 2021 Filing 9 ENTRY of Appearance by Eric D Janzen on behalf of Altus City of, Thomas Hobbs, Jacob Parsons (Janzen, Eric)
September 15, 2021 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bradley Waters, Bryan Waters. Jacob Parsons served on 9/4/2021. (Smolen, Daniel)
September 15, 2021 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bradley Waters, Bryan Waters. Roger Levick served on 9/9/2021. (Smolen, Daniel)
September 15, 2021 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bradley Waters, Bryan Waters. Thomas Hobbs served on 9/4/2021. (Smolen, Daniel)
September 15, 2021 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bradley Waters, Bryan Waters. Jennifer L Hazlewood served on 9/10/2021. (Smolen, Daniel)
September 1, 2021 Filing 4 ENTRY of Appearance by Robert M Blakemore on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Blakemore, Robert)
September 1, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued Electronically as to Altus City of, Jennifer L Hazlewood, Thomas Hobbs, Roger Levick, Jacob Parsons. (jjs)
August 31, 2021 Filing 2 ENTRY of Appearance by Bryon D Helm on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Helm, Bryon)
August 31, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against City of Altus, Oklahoma, Jennifer L Hazlewood, Thomas Hobbs, FNU LNU, Roger Levick, Jacob Parsons filed by Bradley Waters, Bryan Waters. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(jjs)
August 31, 2021 PAYMENT FOR A CIVIL CASE Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AOKWDC-3752051. (Smolen, Daniel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Waters et al v. City of Altus, Oklahoma et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bradley Waters
Represented By: Bryon D Helm
Represented By: Daniel E Smolen
Represented By: Robert M Blakemore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bryan Waters
Represented By: Bryon D Helm
Represented By: Daniel E Smolen
Represented By: Robert M Blakemore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Altus City of
Represented By: Eric D Janzen
Represented By: Sean M McKelvey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FNU LNU
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sheriff Roger Levick
Represented By: Andrew A Artus
Represented By: William R Moon, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Hobbs
Represented By: Eric D Janzen
Represented By: Sean M McKelvey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jacob Parsons
Represented By: Eric D Janzen
Represented By: Sean M McKelvey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jennifer L Hazlewood
Represented By: Anthony C Winter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?