Mack v. Hutchinson et al
Plaintiff: Jamie Marshall Mack
Defendant: Gina Hutchinson, Reece Laive and Joe Harper
Case Number: 5:2021cv00867
Filed: September 1, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Robin J Cauthron
Referring Judge: Suzanne Mitchell
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 12, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 12, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE of Change of Address by Jamie Marshall Mack (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(kah)
September 24, 2021 Filing 10 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #7 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Jamie Marshall Mack. The undersigned recommends that Plaintiff's application be denied. Objections to R&R due by 10/15/2021. This Report and Recommendation disposes of all issues and terminates the referral to the Magistrate Judge. Signed by Magistrate Judge Suzanne Mitchell on 9/24/21. (lb)
September 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER VACATING #8 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #7 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Jamie Marshall Mack. Signed by Magistrate Judge Suzanne Mitchell on 9/24/21. (lb)
September 23, 2021 Filing 8 VACATED~REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #7 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Jamie Marshall Mack. The undersigned recommends that Plaintiff's application be denied. Objections to R&R due by 10/14/2021. This Report and Recommendation disposes of all issues and terminates the referral to the Magistrate Judge. Signed by Magistrate Judge Suzanne Mitchell on 9/23/21. (lb) VACATED by Order on 9/24/2021 (lb).
September 22, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Jamie Marshall Mack. Motions referred to Suzanne Mitchell. (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1 - Financial Statements, #2 Attachment 2 - Payne County Court Documents, #3 Attachment 3 - Requests to Staff, #4 Envelope)(kah)
September 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER regarding #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Plaintiff shall cure the deficiencies on or before 9/30/21. Signed by Magistrate Judge Suzanne Mitchell on 9/9/21. (lb)
September 3, 2021 Filing 5 LETTER from Jamie Marshall Mack (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (kah)
September 3, 2021 Filing 4 ENTER ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Suzanne Mitchell. Motions referred to Suzanne Mitchell. Signed by the direction of Honorable Robin J. Cauthron on 9/3/2021. (kah)
September 3, 2021 Filing 3 NO PREVIOUS Cases (kah)
September 1, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Jamie Marshall Mack. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(kah)
September 1, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Joe Harper, Gina Hutchinson, Reece Laive filed by Jamie Marshall Mack. (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1 - Court Docket Text 1.3.20, #2 Envelope)(kah)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mack v. Hutchinson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jamie Marshall Mack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gina Hutchinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Reece Laive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joe Harper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?