Flaherty v. Office of Juvenile Affairs et al
Plaintiff: Jamie Flaherty
Defendant: Office of Juvenile Affairs, Danny Hall, Thomas Franklin, Brandy Jaggers, Kerlyne Deriscar-Hinds, Tammy Kerchaval, Tammy Acosta, Steven Buck, Terry Smith, Phillip Beaty, Bart Trentham, Dr Bart Trentham PLLC and Tammy Kercheval
Case Number: 5:2021cv00871
Filed: September 3, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Scott L Palk
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 25, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER granting #23 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #23 SECOND MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Notice of Removal, Steven Buck answer due 1/20/2022; Kerlyne Deriscar-Hinds answer due 1/20/2022; Thomas Franklin answer due 1/20/2022; Brandy Jaggers answer due 1/20/2022; Tammy Kercheval answer due 1/20/2022; Office of Juvenile Affairs answer due 1/20/2022; Terry Smith answer due 1/20/2022.. Signed by Judge Scott L. Palk on 10/25/2021. (md)
October 22, 2021 Filing 24 MOTION to Dismiss by Dr Bart Trentham PLLC, Bart Trentham. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Petition)(Ludiker, Emily)
October 21, 2021 Filing 23 SECOND MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Notice of Removal, by Steven Buck, Kerlyne Deriscar-Hinds, Thomas Franklin, Brandy Jaggers, Tammy Kercheval, Office of Juvenile Affairs, Terry Smith. (Pederson, Devan)
October 7, 2021 Filing 22 ENTRY of Appearance by John Spencer Bryan on behalf of Jamie Flaherty (Bryan, John)
September 27, 2021 Filing 21 ENTRY of Appearance by Steven J Terrill on behalf of Jamie Flaherty (Terrill, Steven)
September 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #19 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #19 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Notice of Removal, Dr Bart Trentham PLLC answer due 10/22/2021; Bart Trentham answer due 10/22/2021.. Signed by Judge Scott L. Palk on 9/27/2021. (md)
September 23, 2021 Filing 19 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Notice of Removal, by Dr Bart Trentham PLLC, Bart Trentham. (Ludiker, Emily)
September 23, 2021 Filing 18 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Dr Bart Trentham PLLC . (Ludiker, Emily)
September 23, 2021 Filing 17 NOTICE (other) by Dr Bart Trentham PLLC, Bart Trentham re #1 Notice of Removal, Notice of Consent to Removal (Ludiker, Emily)
September 23, 2021 Filing 16 ENTRY of Appearance by Emily J Ludiker on behalf of Dr Bart Trentham PLLC, Bart Trentham (Ludiker, Emily)
September 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER denying #14 Motion for Extension of Service as more fully set forth herein. Signed by Honorable Scott L. Palk on 9/22/2021. (md)
September 15, 2021 Filing 14 MOTION for Extension of Time for Service by Jamie Flaherty. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Order granting ext, #2 Exhibit 2 - Aff of nonservice Beaty, #3 Exhibit 3 - Aff. of nonservice Hall, #4 Exhibit 4 - returned mail Acosta)(Terrill, Steven)
September 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #10 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #10 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Notice of Removal, Brandy Jaggers answer due 10/22/2021.. Signed by Honorable Scott L. Palk on 9/14/2021. (md)
September 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #11 Motion to Correct Party Name. The Clerk is directed to correct the name of Defendant to Tammy Kercheval. Signed by Honorable Scott L. Palk on 9/14/2021. (md)
September 13, 2021 Filing 11 UNOPPOSED MOTION to Amend/Correct Party Name in Caption by Tammy Kerchaval. (Pederson, Devan)
September 13, 2021 Filing 10 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Notice of Removal, by Brandy Jaggers. (Pederson, Devan)
September 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER striking #8 Motion for Extension of Time to File as more fully set forth herein. Signed by Honorable Scott L. Palk on 9/13/2021. (md)
September 10, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION for Extension of Time for Service by Jamie Flaherty. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Acosta returned mail, #2 Exhibit 2 - Jaggers nonservice affidavit, #3 Exhibit 3 - Beaty nonservice affidavit, #4 Exhibit 4 - Hall nonservice affidavit)(Terrill, Steven)
September 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer; and granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendants OJA, Buck, Smith, Deriscar-Hinds, Franklin and Kerchaval shall answer or otherwise respond to the removed petition on or before October 22, 2021. Signed by Honorable Scott L. Palk on 9/10/2021. (md)
September 9, 2021 Filing 6 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Notice of Removal, by Tammy Kerchaval. (Pederson, Devan)
September 9, 2021 Filing 5 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Notice of Removal, by Steven Buck, Kerlyne Deriscar-Hinds, Thomas Franklin, Office of Juvenile Affairs, Terry Smith. (Pederson, Devan)
September 8, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE (other) by Tammy Acosta re #1 Notice of Removal, Consent to Removal (Pederson, Devan)
September 8, 2021 Filing 3 ENTRY of Appearance by Devan A Pederson on behalf of Tammy Acosta (Pederson, Devan)
September 7, 2021 PAYMENT FOR A CIVIL CASE Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AOKWDC-3754836. (Pederson, Devan)
September 3, 2021 Filing 2 ENTRY of Appearance by Devan A Pederson on behalf of Steven Buck, Kerlyne Deriscar-Hinds, Thomas Franklin, Brandy Jaggers, Tammy Kerchaval, Office of Juvenile Affairs, Terry Smith (Pederson, Devan)
September 3, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from District Court of Pottawatomie County, case number CJ-2020-469 filed by Kerlyne Deriscar-Hinds, Thomas Franklin, Brandy Jaggers, Office of Juvenile Affairs, Terry Smith, Steven Buck, Tammy Kerchaval. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - State Petition, #2 Exhibit 2 - Email, #3 Exhibit 3 - Docket Sheet, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(kmt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Flaherty v. Office of Juvenile Affairs et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jamie Flaherty
Represented By: John Spencer Bryan
Represented By: Steven J Terrill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Office of Juvenile Affairs
Represented By: Devan A Pederson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Danny Hall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Franklin
Represented By: Devan A Pederson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brandy Jaggers
Represented By: Devan A Pederson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kerlyne Deriscar-Hinds
Represented By: Devan A Pederson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tammy Kerchaval
Represented By: Devan A Pederson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tammy Acosta
Represented By: Devan A Pederson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven Buck
Represented By: Devan A Pederson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Terry Smith
Represented By: Devan A Pederson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Phillip Beaty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bart Trentham
Represented By: Emily J Ludiker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr Bart Trentham PLLC
Represented By: Emily J Ludiker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tammy Kercheval
Represented By: Devan A Pederson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?