Crenwelge v. Cale et al
Plaintiff: David Samuel Crenwelge
Defendant: Sheila Cale, Antonio Aguillerra and Leroy Elvis Walker
Case Number: 5:2021cv00893
Filed: September 9, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Shon T Erwin
Referring Judge: Stephen P Friot
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 14, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Having reviewed the Motion, the Court finds Plaintiff is entitled to proceed without prepayment of the full filing fee. However, Plaintiff shall be required to pay the full $350.00 filing fee as set forth. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that on or before October 1, 2021, Plaintiff pay an initial partial filing fee of $20.00. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shon T. Erwin on 9/14/2021. (mc)
September 12, 2021 Filing 4 ENTER ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Shon T. Erwin. Motions referred to Shon T. Erwin. Signed at the direction of The Honorable Stephen P. Friot on 9/12/21. (dtb)
September 12, 2021 Filing 3 PREVIOUS Cases (dtb)
September 9, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by David Samuel Crenwelge. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1- Resident Transaction Details)(dtb)
September 9, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by David Samuel Crenwelge. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(dtb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Crenwelge v. Cale et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Samuel Crenwelge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sheila Cale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Antonio Aguillerra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leroy Elvis Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?