Folsom v. Erwin et al
Plaintiff: Glen Folsom
Defendant: Shon T Erwin and Timothy D DeGiusti
Case Number: 5:2021cv00895
Filed: September 10, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Office: Oklahoma City Office
Presiding Judge: David L Russell
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 15, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 15, 2021 Filing 6 JUDGMENT; In accordance with the Courts Order entered this date, Plaintiffs Complaint is DISMISSED.. Signed by Honorable David L. Russell on 9/15/21. (jw)
September 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Upon review of the Complaint pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915A, because the Court lacks jurisdiction to grant the relief requested by Plaintiff, which is that the judges take all [their] bad orders away reopen and give a lawyer or all thing in the past and more. The Court sua sponte dismisses this action. Signed by Honorable David L. Russell on 9/15/21. (jw) (Main Document 5 replaced on 9/15/2021) (jw).
September 15, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE OF DISQUALIFICATION -- Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 455(b)(5)(i), Magistrate Judge Shon T. Erwin disqualifies himself from the referenced case and directs the Clerk of Court to place this case number in the random draw for reassignment to another magistrate judge of this court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shon T. Erwin on 9/15/2021. (mc)
September 14, 2021 Filing 3 ENTER ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Shon T. Erwin. Signed by the direction of Honorable David L. Russell on 9/14/2021. (kmt)
September 14, 2021 Filing 2 PREVIOUS Cases (kmt)
September 10, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Timothy D DeGiusti, Shon T Erwin filed by Glen Folsom. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(kmt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Folsom v. Erwin et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Glen Folsom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shon T Erwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timothy D DeGiusti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?