Hutson v. Account Management Resources LLC
Plaintiff: Maia Hutson
Defendant: Account Management Resources LLC
Case Number: 5:2021cv00923
Filed: September 20, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Charles Goodwin
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 26, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ADMINISTRATIVE CLOSING ORDER: This action is administratively terminated without prejudice to the rights of the parties to reopen for entry of any stipulation or order. If not reopened within 30 days to obtain final determination, action is deemed dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge Charles Goodwin on 10/26/2021. (jb)
October 21, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Settlement by Maia Hutson (Hill, Tiffany)
September 21, 2021 PAYMENT FOR A CIVIL CASE Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AOKWDC-3765095. (Hill, Tiffany)
September 20, 2021 Filing 4 ENTER ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Charles Goodwin for all further proceedings. Entered by the direction of Honorable Bernard M. Jones on 09/20/2021. (knt)
September 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER OF RECUSAL ~ Honorable Bernard M. Jones recused. Signed by Honorable Bernard M. Jones on 9/20/2021. (dwl)
September 20, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued Electronically as to Account Management Resources LLC. (knt)
September 20, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Account Management Resources LLC filed by Maia Hutson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(knt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hutson v. Account Management Resources LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maia Hutson
Represented By: Tiffany L Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Account Management Resources LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?