Isaacs et al v. Total Aggregate LLC et al
Plaintiff: James Isaacs and Lance Bishop
Defendant: Total Aggregate LLC, Tandem Trucking LLC, Laurie Ranney Kyles, Kirby Kyles and Kasey Kyles
Case Number: 5:2021cv00945
Filed: September 24, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Bernard M Jones
Referring Judge: Patrick R Wyrick
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 17, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 17, 2021 Filing 21 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Plaintiffs 2nd Supp Disclosures)(Rice, Richard)
November 10, 2021 Filing 20 REPLY to Response to Motion re #14 MOTION for Sanctions filed by All Defendants. (Rice, Richard)
November 5, 2021 Filing 19 RESPONSE in Opposition re #14 MOTION for Sanctions filed by Lance Bishop, James Isaacs(Individually), James Isaacs(On behalf of all others similarly situated). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Email with Draft Rule 11 Motion, #2 Exhibit 2 - Declaration of Matthew S. Parmet, #3 Proposed Order)(Parmet, Matthew)
November 2, 2021 Filing 18 ENTRY of Appearance by Matthew S Parmet on behalf of Lance Bishop, James Isaacs(Individually), James Isaacs(On behalf of all others similarly situated) (Parmet, Matthew)
October 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER ~ re #14 MOTION for Sanctions. In light of the nature of the motion, the Court hereby SHORTENS Plaintiffs' time to file their response to this motion and ORDERS Plaintiffs to file their response by November 5, 2021. Additionally, any reply shall be filed by November 10, 2021. Signed by Judge Bernard M. Jones on 10/29/2021. (dwl)
October 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER ~ Because Plaintiffs' First Amended Collective Action Complaint has been filed, the Court FINDS Defendants' Motion to Dismiss #9 is now MOOT. Further, the Court FINDS Plaintiffs' Motion for Judicial Notice #12 , filed in conjunction with their response to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss, is also now MOOT. Signed by Judge Bernard M. Jones on 10/29/2021. (dwl)
October 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER ~ Granting #2 Plaintiffs' Motion to Proceed without Local Counsel. Signed by Judge Bernard M. Jones on 10/29/2021. (dwl)
October 28, 2021 Filing 14 MOTION for Sanctions by All Defendants. (Rice, Richard)
October 27, 2021 Filing 13 RESPONSE in Opposition re #9 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Lance Bishop, James Isaacs(Individually), James Isaacs(On behalf of all others similarly situated). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Decl of MSP, #2 Proposed Order)(Parmet, Matthew)
October 27, 2021 Filing 12 MOTION for Order Taking Judicial Notice by Lance Bishop, James Isaacs(Individually), James Isaacs(On behalf of all others similarly situated). (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Parmet, Matthew)
October 27, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE (other) by Lance Bishop, James Isaacs(Individually), James Isaacs(On behalf of all others similarly situated) re #10 Amended Complaint,,, Notice of Filing First Amended Complaint (Parmet, Matthew)
October 27, 2021 Filing 10 AMENDED COMPLAINT (FIRST) against All Defendants filed by James Isaacs(Individually), James Isaacs(On behalf of all others similarly situated), Lance Bishop. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Consent of Isaacs, #2 Exhibit 2 - Consent of Bayne, #3 Exhibit 3 - Consent of Bishop, #4 Exhibit 4 - Consent of Cordes, #5 Exhibit 5 - Consent of Dobbins, #6 Exhibit 6 - Consent of Dubach, #7 Exhibit 7 - Consent of Freeman, #8 Exhibit 8 - Consent of Freeman, #9 Exhibit 9 - Consent of Good, #10 Exhibit 10 - Consent of Hernandez, #11 Exhibit 11 - Consent of Hurley, #12 Exhibit 12 - Consent of Jackson, #13 Exhibit 13 - Consent of Jackson, #14 Exhibit 14 - Consent of Jackson, #15 Exhibit 15 - Consent of Lane, #16 Exhibit 16 - Consent of Reinhardt, #17 Exhibit 17 - Consent of Williams)(Parmet, Matthew)
October 6, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Plaintiffs 2nd Supp Disclosures)(Rice, Richard)
October 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Bernard M. Jones for all further proceedings. Judge Patrick R Wyrick no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Patrick R Wyrick on 10/1/2021. (ks)
September 30, 2021 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Defendants Kasey Kyles, Kirby Kyles, Laurie Ranney Kyles, Tandem Trucking LLC, Total Aggregate LLC. Kasey Kyles waiver sent on 9/29/2021, answer due 11/29/2021; Kirby Kyles waiver sent on 9/29/2021, answer due 11/29/2021; Laurie Ranney Kyles waiver sent on 9/29/2021, answer due 11/29/2021; Tandem Trucking LLC waiver sent on 9/29/2021, answer due 11/29/2021; Total Aggregate LLC waiver sent on 9/29/2021, answer due 11/29/2021. (Parmet, Matthew)
September 29, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE OF RELATED OR COMPANION CASE by James Isaacs(Individually), James Isaacs(On behalf of all others similarly situated) (Parmet, Matthew)
September 29, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE OF RELATED OR COMPANION CASE by All Defendants re #1 Complaint,,,, (Rice, Richard)
September 29, 2021 Filing 4 ENTRY of Appearance by Richard R Rice on behalf of All Defendants (Rice, Richard)
September 28, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued Electronically as to All Defendants. (dtb)
September 24, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed Without Local Counsel by James Isaacs(Individually), James Isaacs(On behalf of all others similarly situated). (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Parmet, Matthew)
September 24, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Kasey Kyles, Kirby Kyles, Laurie Ranney Kyles, Tandem Trucking LLC, Total Aggregate LLC filed by James Isaacs(Individually), James Isaacs(On behalf of all others similarly situated). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Consent of James Isaacs, #2 Exhibit 2 - Consent of John Bayne, #3 Exhibit 3 - Consent of Lance Bishop, #4 Exhibit 4 - Consent of Samuel Cordes, #5 Exhibit 5 - Consent of Stephen Dobbins, #6 Exhibit 6 - Consent of Don Dubach, #7 Exhibit 7 - Consent of Robert Freeman, #8 Exhibit 8 - Consent of Teresa Freeman, #9 Exhibit 9 - Consent of Aaron Good, #10 Exhibit 10 - Consent of Juan Hernandez, #11 Exhibit 11 - Consent of Brandon Hurley, #12 Exhibit 12 - Consent of Anthony Jackson, #13 Exhibit 13 - Consent of James Jackson, #14 Exhibit 14 - Consent of Roger Jackson, #15 Exhibit 15 - Consent of Aaron Lane, #16 Exhibit 16 - Consent of Matthew Reinhardt, #17 Exhibit 17 - Consent of Scott Williams, #18 Civil Cover Sheet)(kmt)
September 24, 2021 PAYMENT FOR A CIVIL CASE Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AOKWDC-3768212. (Parmet, Matthew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Isaacs et al v. Total Aggregate LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Isaacs
Represented By: Matthew S Parmet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lance Bishop
Represented By: Matthew S Parmet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Total Aggregate LLC
Represented By: Richard R Rice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tandem Trucking LLC
Represented By: Richard R Rice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Laurie Ranney Kyles
Represented By: Richard R Rice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kirby Kyles
Represented By: Richard R Rice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kasey Kyles
Represented By: Richard R Rice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?