Bailey et al v. Franklin Corporation
Plaintiff: Peter Bailey and Tamara Bailey
Defendant: Franklin Corporation
Case Number: 5:2021cv00969
Filed: September 29, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Patrick R Wyrick
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1446
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 10, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SCHEDULING ORDER: Jury Trial set on the September 2022 trial docket (9/13/2022 09:30 AM) in Courtroom 503 before Judge Patrick R Wyrick; Motions to join due 30 days from date of this order; Motions to amend due 30 days from date of this order; Pla expert witness list and expert reports due 6/29/2022; Dft expert witness list and expert reports due 7/11/2022; Pla witness list due 6/29/2022; Dft witness list due 7/11/2022; Pla exhibit list due 6/29/2022; Dft exhibit list due 7/11/2022; Motions in limine due 8/25/2022; Jury instructions due 8/25/2022; Voir dire requests due 8/25/2022; Trial briefs due 8/25/2022; Discovery due by 8/1/2022. Motions due by 6/29/2022. Pretrial Report due by 8/25/2022. Signed by Judge Patrick R Wyrick on 10/26/2021. (ks)
October 19, 2021 Filing 8 JOINT STATUS REPORT AND DISCOVERY PLAN by Defendant Franklin Corporation. (Bowers, Brock)
October 5, 2021 Filing 7 NOVEMBER STATUS & SCHEDULING CONFERENCE DOCKET: Scheduling Conference set for 10/26/2021 10:10 AM in Courtroom 503 before Judge Patrick R Wyrick. Status Report due by 10/19/2021. (ks)
October 1, 2021 Filing 6 FIRST ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by All Defendants.(Bowers, Brock)
September 30, 2021 Filing 5 ENTRY of Appearance by Katie R McCune on behalf of All Defendants (McCune, Katie)
September 30, 2021 Filing 4 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by All Defendants Franklin Corporation. (Bowers, Brock)
September 30, 2021 Filing 3 ENTRY of Appearance by Brock C Bowers on behalf of All Defendants (Bowers, Brock)
September 29, 2021 Filing 2 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Franklin Corporation. (kmt)
September 29, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from District Court of Canadian County, case number CJ-2020-591 filed by Franklin Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Docket Sheet, #2 Exhibit 2 - Plaintiff's Petition, #3 Exhibit 3 - Amended Petition, #4 Exhibit 4 - Summons Issued, #5 Exhibit 5 - Filed Summons, #6 Exhibit 6 - Alias Summons Issued, #7 Civil Cover Sheet)(kmt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bailey et al v. Franklin Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peter Bailey
Represented By: Daniel M Delluomo
Represented By: Steven W Crow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tamara Bailey
Represented By: Daniel M Delluomo
Represented By: Steven W Crow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Franklin Corporation
Represented By: Brock C Bowers
Represented By: Katie R McCune
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?