Herman v. Sig Sauer Inc
Plaintiff: John Tyler Herman
Defendant: Sig Sauer Inc
Case Number: 5:2021cv01038
Filed: October 25, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Charles Goodwin
Referring Judge: Scott L Palk
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 8, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 13, 2021 Filing 20 ENTRY of Appearance by Daniel L Ceisler on behalf of John Tyler Herman (Ceisler, Daniel)
December 8, 2021 Filing 19 ENTRY of Appearance by Robert Zimmerman on behalf of John Tyler Herman (Zimmerman, Robert)
December 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #5 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. On or before December 16, 2021, Attorney Ceisler shall electronically file an entry of appearance on the form prescribed by the Clerk of Court. Signed by Judge Charles Goodwin on 12/07/2021. (jb)
December 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #6 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. On or before December 16, 2021, Attorney Zimmerman shall electronically file an entry of appearance on the form prescribed by the Clerk of Court. Signed by Judge Charles Goodwin on 12/07/2021. (jb)
December 7, 2021 Filing 16 Receipt for Money Received from John Tyler Herman in the amount of $50, receipt number OKW500088378 regarding #15 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Nicholas Gurney (kah)
December 7, 2021 Filing 15 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Nicholas Gurney by John Tyler Herman. (Allred, Raymond)
December 7, 2021 Filing 14 ENTRY of Appearance by Raymond S Allred on behalf of John Tyler Herman (Allred, Raymond)
December 7, 2021 Filing 13 ENTRY of Appearance by Colton L Richardson on behalf of John Tyler Herman (Richardson, Colton)
December 7, 2021 Filing 12 ENTRY of Appearance by Colton L Richardson on behalf of John Tyler Herman (Richardson, Colton)
December 7, 2021 Filing 11 ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Executed Acknowledgement filed by Plaintiff John Tyler Herman. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Summons)(Richardson, Colton)
December 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER. Counsel for Plaintiff shall enter an appearance within seven (7) days of the date of this Order. Signed by Judge Charles Goodwin on 12/06/2021. (jb)
December 2, 2021 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Defendant Sig Sauer Inc. Sig Sauer Inc waiver sent on 11/23/2021, answer due 1/24/2022. (Zimmerman, Robert)
December 2, 2021 Filing 8 Receipt for Money Received from John Tyler Herman in the amount of $50, receipt number OKW500088298 regarding #6 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Robert W. Zimmerman (kah)
December 2, 2021 Filing 7 Receipt for Money Received from John Tyler Herman in the amount of $50, receipt number OKW500088299 regarding #5 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Daniel L. Ceisler (kah)
December 2, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Robert W. Zimmerman by John Tyler Herman. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Richardson, Colton)
December 2, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Daniel L. Ceisler by John Tyler Herman. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Richardson, Colton)
October 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Charles Goodwin for all further proceedings. Judge Scott L. Palk no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Scott L. Palk on 10/26/2021. (md)
October 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Signed by Judge Scott L. Palk on 10/26/2021. (md)
October 25, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued Electronically as to Sig Sauer Inc. (kmt)
October 25, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Sig Sauer Inc filed by John Tyler Herman. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(kmt)
October 25, 2021 PAYMENT FOR A CIVIL CASE Filing fee $ 402, receipt number BOKWDC-3786557. (Allred, Raymond)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Herman v. Sig Sauer Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Tyler Herman
Represented By: Raymond S Allred
Represented By: Colton L Richardson
Represented By: Daniel L Ceisler
Represented By: Robert Zimmerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sig Sauer Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?