Horton v. Hoffman et al
Plaintiff: John D Horton
Defendant: Jared T Hoffman and Stephen Eschenbacher
Case Number: 5:2021cv01098
Filed: November 16, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Scott L Palk
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 551
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 3, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 3, 2022 Filing 6 Summons Issued Electronically as to Stephen Eschenbacher, Jared T Hoffman. (kmt)
December 20, 2021 Docket Annotation: Received Complaint service copies and USM forms as to US Attorney General, US Attorney, Stephen Eschenbacher, and Jared Hoffman. No summons were received. (kmt)
December 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ENTER ORDER The Clerk is directed that any filings by the Court will be emailed to Plaintiff at the email address provided: johndhorton@yahoo.com. The Court advises the Plaintiff that due to his pro se status, he is not entitled to file documents with the Court electronically and must either mail them to the Court or present them for filing in person. See ECF Policies & Procedures Manual, I.A.1. The Clerk is directed to email Plaintiff a copy of the this Enter Order along with a copy of the Order entered November 23, 2021, granting his Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis #4 at the address indicated above.. Signed by Judge Scott L. Palk on 12/17/2021. (md)
November 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shon T. Erwin on 11/23/2021. (mc)
November 18, 2021 Filing 3 ENTER ORDER REFERRING MOTION: #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by John D Horton Motions referred to Shon T. Erwin. Signed by the direction of Judge Scott L. Palk on 11/18/2021. (kmt)
November 16, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by John D Horton. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(kmt)
November 16, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Stephen Eschenbacher, Jared T Hoffman filed by John D Horton. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Letter from Lawton Postmaster, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Envelope)(kmt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Horton v. Hoffman et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John D Horton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jared T Hoffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephen Eschenbacher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?