Essential Ingredients Inc v. Coil Chem LLC
Plaintiff: Essential Ingredients Inc
Defendant: Coil Chem LLC
Case Number: 5:2021fj00004
Filed: April 14, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Scott L Palk
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 10, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 10, 2021 Filing 7 ANSWER to Writ of Garnishment re #6 Post-Judgment Writ of Garnishment by First National Bank & Trust Co. (kmt)
April 29, 2021 Filing 6 POST-JUDGMENT Writ of Garnishment to First National Bank and Trust Company. (md)
April 29, 2021 Filing 5 GENERAL WRIT OF EXECUTION issued. (md)
April 28, 2021 NOTICE FROM THE COURT #4 MOTION for Writ of Garnishment is STRICKEN. This document is not a Motion. Counsel shall present the Writ for issuance in accordance with ECF Policies & Procedures Manual, Section II.G.3. (md)
April 27, 2021 Filing 4 STRICKEN MOTION for Writ of Garnishment by Essential Ingredients Inc. (Laasch, Jon) Pursuant to Notice from the Court on 4/28/2021 (md).
April 27, 2021 Filing 3 AFFIDAVIT OF GARNISHMENT that Defendant is indebted to Plaintiff in the amount of $ $115,632 by Essential Ingredients Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Judgment, #2 Attachment Garnishment Summons)(Laasch, Jon)
April 19, 2021 Filing 2 Receipt for Money Received from Essential Ingredients Inc in the amount of $49.00, receipt number OKW500085074 regarding #1 Registration of Foreign Judgment (kmt)
April 14, 2021 Filing 1 REGISTRATION of Foreign Judgment. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(kmt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Essential Ingredients Inc v. Coil Chem LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Coil Chem LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Essential Ingredients Inc
Represented By: Jon W Laasch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?