Garg v. VHS Acquisition Subsidiary No 7 Inc et al
Petitioner: Ashu Garg
Respondent: VHS Acquisition Subsidiary No 7 Inc doing business as Saint Vincent Hospital, David Bader, John Mukai and Douglas Burd
Case Number: 5:2021mc00005
Filed: October 19, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: David L Russell
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 7, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER re #1 Petition filed by Ashu Garg Before the Court is the Petition to Quash Non-Party Subpoena filed by Dr. AshuGarg (Petitioner or Dr. Garg). Doc. No. 1. Dr. Garg seeks to quash a non-party subpoena issued to the Board and Regents of the University of Oklahoma. The matter is fully briefed and is at issue. The Court DENIES the Petition, as more fully set out. Signed by Judge David L. Russell on 12/7/21. (jw)
November 17, 2021 Filing 19 ENTRY of Appearance by Olivia Vehslage on behalf of David Bader, Douglas Burd, Ashu Garg, VHS Acquisition Subsidiary No 7 Inc (Vehslage, Olivia)
November 17, 2021 Filing 18 ENTRY of Appearance by Diane M Saunders on behalf of David Bader, Douglas Burd, John Mukai, VHS Acquisition Subsidiary No 7 Inc (Saunders, Diane)
November 16, 2021 Filing 17 REPLY by Petitioner Ashu Garg re #13 Response, filed by Ashu Garg. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Caselaw - Ireh v. Nassau University Medical Center, #2 Exhibit Email with Respondents' Counsel, #3 Exhibit Order Granting Motion to File Exhibit Under Seal in Garg v. Oklahoma)(Perry, Matthew)
November 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #14 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Diane M. Saunders; granting #15 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Olivia L. Vehslage. Signed by Judge David L. Russell on 1/10/2021. (cr)
November 9, 2021 Filing 15 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Olivia Vehslage Filing fee $ 50, receipt number AOKWDC-3796136 by David Bader, Douglas Burd, John Mukai, VHS Acquisition Subsidiary No 7 Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Request for Admission Pro Hac Vice for O. Vehslage)(Fulkerson, Samuel)
November 9, 2021 Filing 14 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Diane Saunders Filing fee $ 50, receipt number AOKWDC-3796129 by David Bader, Douglas Burd, John Mukai, VHS Acquisition Subsidiary No 7 Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1- Request for Admission Pro Hac Vice for D. Saunders)(Fulkerson, Samuel)
November 9, 2021 Filing 13 RESPONSE re #1 Petition, #2 Memorandum in Support in Opposition filed by David Bader, Douglas Burd, John Mukai, VHS Acquisition Subsidiary No 7 Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1- Petition, #2 Exhibit 2 - Massachusetts Complaint, #3 Exhibit 3 - Automatic Disclosures, #4 Exhibit 4 - Stipulated Protective Order)(Fulkerson, Samuel)
November 9, 2021 Filing 12 ENTRY of Appearance by Samuel R Fulkerson on behalf of David Bader, Douglas Burd, John Mukai, VHS Acquisition Subsidiary No 7 Inc (Fulkerson, Samuel)
October 26, 2021 Filing 11 ENTRY of Appearance by Kavita Goyal on behalf of Ashu Garg (Goyal, Kavita)
October 26, 2021 Filing 10 ENTRY of Appearance by Matthew Perry on behalf of Ashu Garg (Perry, Matthew)
October 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #6 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Matthew Perry; granting #7 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Kavita Goyal. Signed by Judge David L. Russell on 10/22/21. (jw)
October 20, 2021 Filing 8 Receipts for Money Received from Ashu Garg in the amount of $50.00 each, receipt numbers OKW500087703 and OKW500087704, regarding #7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Attorney Kavita Goyal, #6 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Attorney Matthew Perry. (knt)
October 20, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Attorney Kavita Goyal by Ashu Garg. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Request for Admission Pro Hac Vice)(Gould, Tony)
October 20, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Attorney Matthew Perry by Ashu Garg. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Request for Admission Pro Hac Vice)(Gould, Tony)
October 20, 2021 Filing 5 ENTRY of Appearance by Tony Gould on behalf of Ashu Garg (Gould, Tony)
October 20, 2021 Filing 4 Receipt for Money Received from Ashu Garg in the amount of $49, receipt number OKW500087698 regarding #1 Petition (dtb)
October 19, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE OF RELATED OR COMPANION CASE by Ashu Garg (kah)
October 19, 2021 Filing 2 MEMORANDUM of Law in Support re #1 Petition filed by Ashu Garg. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Complaint, #2 Exhibit 2 - Letter from Matthew Perry)(kah)
October 19, 2021 Filing 1 PETITION to Quash Subpoena filed by Ashu Garg. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Subpoena, Schedule A, Affidavit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(kah)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Garg v. VHS Acquisition Subsidiary No 7 Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Ashu Garg
Represented By: Tony Gould
Represented By: Kavita Goyal
Represented By: Matthew Perry
Represented By: Olivia L Vehslage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: VHS Acquisition Subsidiary No 7 Inc doing business as Saint Vincent Hospital
Represented By: Diane M Saunders
Represented By: Olivia L Vehslage
Represented By: Samuel R Fulkerson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: David Bader
Represented By: Diane M Saunders
Represented By: Olivia L Vehslage
Represented By: Samuel R Fulkerson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: John Mukai
Represented By: Diane M Saunders
Represented By: Samuel R Fulkerson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Douglas Burd
Represented By: Diane M Saunders
Represented By: Olivia L Vehslage
Represented By: Samuel R Fulkerson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?