Williams v. Nunn
Petitioner: Brian G Williams
Respondent: John O'Connor, Director DOC Scott Crow, John O and Scott Nunn
Case Number: 5:2022cv00007
Filed: January 4, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Office: Oklahoma City Office
Presiding Judge: Shon T Erwin
Referring Judge: Scott L Palk
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 4, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MOTION for Order titled, "Objection to Magistrates Recommendation: 28 USC 636(b)(1)(B) and (c); Petitioners Request for Additional Time because of States Impediment" by Brian G Williams. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(rr)
February 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 JUDGMENT OF DISMISSAL In accordance with the Order entered this 10th day of February, 2022, this matter is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Further, a certificate of appealability is denied. Signed by Judge Scott L. Palk on 2/10/22. (md)
February 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER adopting Report and Recommendations re #9 Report and Recommendation. This matter is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Scott L. Palk on 2/10/22. (md)
January 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION -- the undersigned recommends that the court DISMISS the Petition #1 on screening for failure to exhaust state court remedies. This Report and Recommendation terminates the referral. Objections to R&R due by 1/31/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shon T. Erwin on 1/12/2022. (mc)
January 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Magistrate Judge Shon T. Erwin no longer assigned to case. (mc)
January 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ENTER ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Shon T. Erwin. Signed by the direction of Judge Scott L. Palk on 1/4/2022. (kmt)
January 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NO PREVIOUS Cases (kmt)
January 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Case transferred in from District of Oklahoma Eastern; Case Number 6:21-cv-00373.
January 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Notice of Mailing LCvR5.4/Change of Address form, docket sheet, and #8 Enter Order to : Brian G Williams#646397James Crabtree Correctional Center216 N Murray StreetHelena, OK 73741-9606(kmt)
January 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 OPINION AND ORDER by District Judge Ronald A. White, transferring case to the Western District of Oklahoma (case terminated) (acg, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from Oklahoma Eastern on 1/4/2022.]
December 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kimberly E. West: Terminating Scott Crow and John O'Connor as respondents in this action. Petitioner is incarcerated at James Crabtree Correctional Center, and the warden of that facility is the proper respondent in this case. See Rule 2(a) of the Rules Governing Section 2254 Cases; Braden v. 30th Judicial Circuit Court of Ky., 410 U.S. 484, 494-95 (1973). The case name is hereby changed to Brian G. Williams, Petitioner, v. Scott Nunn, Warden, Respondent(acg, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from Oklahoma Eastern on 1/4/2022.]
December 27, 2021 Opinion or Order FILING FEES Paid in Full on 12/27/2021 in the amount of $5, receipt number 19773 (Re: #1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus - 2254 ) by Brian G. Williams (tjm, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from Oklahoma Eastern on 1/4/2022.]
December 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kimberly E. West: Upon review of the file in this case, the Court finds that the petitioner has not submitted a proper motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis or paid the $5.00 filing fee. The petitioner is directed to submit a properly executed motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis, with original signature and have the Trust Fund Officer at his/her facility complete (with an original signature) the Required Certification (Page 3) and provide a current 6-month financial accounting statement and return the completed motion to the Office of the Clerk or pay the filing fee of $5.00 within 20 days or by 1/19/22. The Clerk is directed to provide the plaintiff with a motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis form and an instruction sheet.(acg, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from Oklahoma Eastern on 1/4/2022.]
December 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 MINUTE ORDER by District Judge Ronald A. White, referring case to Magistrate Judge Kimberly E. West for all further proceedings in accordance with jurisdiction pursuant to 28 USC 636. All future filings shall bear the case number CIV-21-373-RAW-KEW. (acg, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from Oklahoma Eastern on 1/4/2022.]
December 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus - 2254 by Brian G. Williams (acg, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from Oklahoma Eastern on 1/4/2022.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams v. Nunn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: John O'Connor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Director DOC Scott Crow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: John O
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Scott Nunn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Brian G Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?