Wilkins v. Nunn
Petitioner: Jimmie D Wilkins
Respondent: John O'Connell, Director DOC Scott Crow, John O and Scott Nunn
Case Number: 5:2022cv00008
Filed: January 4, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Office: Oklahoma City Office
Presiding Judge: Amanda Maxfield Green
Referring Judge: Bernard M Jones
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 3, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 OBJECTION TO REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION #9 filed by Jimmie D Wilkins. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - DOC Request for Disbursement, #2 Envelope)(so)
March 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER ~ re #9 Report and Recommendation. The Court is now in receipt of Petitioners filing fee. Accordingly, the Report and Recommendation is MOOTED and the matter is RE-REFERRED to Judge Green. Signed by Judge Bernard M. Jones on 3/1/2022. (dwl)
February 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Receipt for Money Received from Jimmie D Wilkins in the amount of $5.00, receipt number OKW500089419 regarding #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. Receipt mailed to Jimmie D Wilkins #865582 HELENA-JCCC 216 N. Murray St. Helena, OK 73741-9606 (jjs)
February 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER ~ The Court will extend Petitioner's deadline for compliance with the Order and Petitioner is given leave to pay the filing fee or move to proceed in forma pauperis by March 10, 2022. Signed by Judge Bernard M. Jones on 2/17/2022. (dwl)
February 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MOTION for Order titled "Motion Objection to Magistrates Recomendation 28 U.S.C.S. 636(b)(1)(e) and F.R.Civ.P.72(b)(2)" by Jimmie D Wilkins. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(km)
February 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. The undersigned recommends that this action be DISMISSED without prejudice to the re-filing for Petitioner's failure to pay the filing fee and to comply with the courts order. Objections to R&R due by 3/1/2022. This Report and Recommendation terminates the referral of this matter to the undersigned. Signed by Magistrate Judge Amanda Maxfield Green on 2/8/2022. (rb)
January 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER to Cure Deficiencies. Signed by Magistrate Judge Amanda Maxfield Green on 1/11/2022. (rb)
January 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ENTER ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Amanda Maxfield Green. Entered at the direction of Judge Bernard M. Jones on 01/04/2022. (km)
January 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NO PREVIOUS Cases. (km)
January 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Case transferred in from District of Oklahoma Eastern; Case Number 6:22-cv-00001.
January 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 OPINION AND ORDER by District Judge Ronald A. White, transferring case to the Western District of Oklahoma (case terminated) (acg, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from Oklahoma Eastern on 1/4/2022.]
January 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kimberly E. West: Terminating Scott Crow and John OConnor as respondents in this action. Petitioner is incarcerated at James Crabtree Correctional Center, and the warden of that facility is the proper respondent in this case. See Rule 2(a) of the Rules Governing Section 2254 Cases; Braden v. 30th Judicial Circuit Court of Ky., 410 U.S. 484, 494-95 (1973). The case name is hereby changed to Jimmie D. Wilkins, Petitioner, v. Scott Nunn, Warden, Respondent.(acg, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from Oklahoma Eastern on 1/4/2022.]
January 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 MINUTE ORDER by District Judge Ronald A. White, referring case to Magistrate Judge Kimberly E. West for all further proceedings in accordance with jurisdiction pursuant to 28 USC 636. All future filings shall bear the case number CIV-22-01-RAW-KEW. (acg, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from Oklahoma Eastern on 1/4/2022.]
January 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus - 2254 by Jimmie D. Wilkins (acg, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from Oklahoma Eastern on 1/4/2022.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wilkins v. Nunn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: John O'Connell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Director DOC Scott Crow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: John O
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Scott Nunn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Jimmie D Wilkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?