Syrus v. National Basketball Association et al
Plaintiff: Charles A Syrus, Jr
Defendant: National Basketball Association, Professional Basketball Club (PBC) LLC, Team Players Union and McAfee & Taft
Case Number: 5:2022cv00021
Filed: January 6, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Timothy D DeGiusti
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Federal Question: Other Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 20, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 20, 2022 Filing 7 JUDGMENT. Signed by Chief Judge Timothy D. DeGiusti on 1/20/2022. (kmt)
January 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER. Signed by Chief Judge Timothy D. DeGiusti on 1/20/2022. (kmt)
January 13, 2022 Filing 5 ENTER ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Chief Judge Timothy D. DeGiusti for all further proceedings. Judge Stephen P. Friot no longer assigned to case. Entered at the direction of Judge Stephen P. Friot on 1/13/2022. (llg)
January 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Let the applicant proceed without prepayment of costs or fees or the necessity of giving security therefor. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gary M. Purcell on 1/11/2022. (cps)
January 10, 2022 Filing 3 ENTER ORDER REFERRING MOTION: #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Charles A Syrus Jr. Motion referred to Gary M. Purcell.. Signed at the direction of Judge Stephen P. Friot on 1/10/2022. (dtb)
January 6, 2022 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Charles A Syrus Jr. (dtb)
January 6, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Charles A Syrus Jr. (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1- Supporting Documents Part 1, #2 Attachment 2- Supporting Documents Part 2, #3 Attachment 3- Supporting Documents Part 3, #4 Attachment 4- Supporting Documents Part 4, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(dtb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Syrus v. National Basketball Association et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles A Syrus, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Basketball Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Professional Basketball Club (PBC) LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Team Players Union
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McAfee & Taft
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?