Jackson et al v. Western Flyer Express LLC
Plaintiff: Kelvin Jackson
Defendant: Western Flyer Express LLC
Case Number: 5:2022cv00068
Filed: January 24, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Bernard M Jones
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 21, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER ~ Granting #27 Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Opposition to Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiff shall file his opposition to Defendant's motion to dismiss by April 14, 2022. Signed by Judge Bernard M. Jones on 3/21/2022. (dwl)
March 18, 2022 Filing 27 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Opposition to Motion to Dismiss by Kelvin Jackson(individually). (Schwab, Hillary)
March 7, 2022 Filing 26 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - LLC by Western Flyer Express LLC . (Smith, Michael)
March 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER ~ re #24 Disclosure Statement - Corporate filed by Western Flyer Express LLC. Defendant's filing is STRICKEN for failure to comply with LCvR7.1.1 and Defendant is ORDERED to file a compliant disclosure statement no later than March 10, 2022. Signed by Judge Bernard M. Jones on 3/4/2022. (dwl)
March 3, 2022 Filing 24 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Western Flyer Express LLC . (Smith, Michael) *STRICKEN per Order #25 filed 3/4/2022.
March 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER ~ Defendant has not yet filed a disclosure statement in compliance with LCvR7.1.1. Defendant is hereby ORDERED to file a disclosure statement no later than March 10, 2022. Signed by Judge Bernard M. Jones on 3/3/2022. (dwl)
March 3, 2022 Filing 22 MOTION to Dismiss and Brief in Support by Western Flyer Express LLC. (Smith, Michael)
February 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER ~ Granting #20 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant may file its responsive pleading to Plaintiff's Complaint by March 3, 2022. Signed by Judge Bernard M. Jones on 2/14/2022. (dwl)
February 14, 2022 Filing 20 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Complaint by Western Flyer Express LLC. (Smith, Michael)
February 14, 2022 Filing 19 ENTRY of Appearance by Christopher Scaperlanda on behalf of Western Flyer Express LLC (Scaperlanda, Christopher) Modified on 2/14/2022 to correctly identify filing attorney. (km)
February 14, 2022 Filing 18 ENTRY of Appearance by Michael F Smith on behalf of Western Flyer Express LLC (Smith, Michael)
February 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER ~ Granting #16 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Mr. Donelon is permitted to withdraw as counsel of record for Plaintiffs and is relieved of further appearance or participation. Signed by Judge Bernard M. Jones on 2/7/2022. (dwl)
February 7, 2022 Filing 16 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Brendan J. Donelon by All Plaintiffs. (Donelon, Brendan)
February 3, 2022 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kelvin Jackson(individually). Western Flyer Express LLC served on 1/27/2022. (Casavant, Brant)
February 1, 2022 Filing 14 ENTRY of Appearance by Rachel J Smit on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Smit, Rachel)
February 1, 2022 Filing 13 ENTRY of Appearance by Brant Casavant on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Casavant, Brant)
February 1, 2022 Filing 12 ENTRY of Appearance by Hillary Schwab on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Schwab, Hillary)
January 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER ~ Granting #8 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Brant Casavant, Hillary Schwab, and Rachel Smit. Mr. Casavant, Ms. Schwab, and Ms. Smit are admitted to practice before this Court for the limited purpose of participating in this case. Each attorney must file an entry of appearance. Signed by Judge Bernard M. Jones on 1/31/2022. (dwl)
January 28, 2022 Filing 10 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Rachel Smit Filing fee $ 50, receipt number AOKWDC-3841886 by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit aff smit)(Taylor, Jeffery)
January 28, 2022 Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Hillary Schwab Filing fee $ 50, receipt number AOKWDC-3841882 by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit aff hillary)(Taylor, Jeffery)
January 28, 2022 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Brant Casavant Filing fee $ 50, receipt number AOKWDC-3841872 by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit affidavit)(Taylor, Jeffery)
January 28, 2022 Filing 7 ENTRY of Appearance by Jeffery A Taylor on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Taylor, Jeffery)
January 26, 2022 Filing 6 ENTRY of Appearance by Brendan J Donelon on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Donelon, Brendan)
January 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER ~ Denying #3 , #4 Motions to Appear Pro Hac Vice, but may be refiled by local counsel without repayment of the filing fees. Signed by Judge Bernard M. Jones on 1/26/2022. (dwl)
January 26, 2022 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Attorney Rachel Smit Filing fee $ 50, receipt number AOKWDC-3839829 by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Request for Admission Pro Hac Vice)(Donelon, Brendan)
January 26, 2022 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Attorney Brant Casavant Filing fee $ 50, receipt number AOKWDC-3839825 by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Request for Admission Pro Hac Vice)(Donelon, Brendan)
January 24, 2022 Filing 2 Summons Issued Electronically as to Western Flyer Express LLC. (rr)
January 24, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Western Flyer Express LLC filed by Kelvin Jackson(individually), Kelvin Jackson(on behalf of all others similarly situated). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Operator Agreement, #2 Exhibit 2 - Lease Agreement, #3 Exhibit 3 - Website Screenshot, #4 Exhibit 4 - Website Screenshot, #5 Exhibit 5 - Mobile Comm Agreement, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(rr)
January 24, 2022 PAYMENT FOR A CIVIL CASE Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AOKWDC-3838343. (Donelon, Brendan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jackson et al v. Western Flyer Express LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kelvin Jackson
Represented By: Brendan J Donelon
Represented By: Brant Casavant
Represented By: Hillary A Schwab
Represented By: Jeffery A Taylor
Represented By: Rachel J Smit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Western Flyer Express LLC
Represented By: Christopher M Scaperlanda
Represented By: Michael F Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?