Viviani v. Coffey and Associates Inc et al
Plaintiff: Nina Viviani
Defendant: Coffey and Associates Inc and CY Coffey
Case Number: 5:2022cv00090
Filed: January 31, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Patrick R Wyrick
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 9, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER granting #23 plaintiff's motion for leave to appear by telephone at the April 5th scheduling conference. Signed by Judge Patrick R Wyrick on 3/30/2022. (ks)
March 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 23 MOTION for Leave to Appear by Telephone For the April 5, 2022 Scheduling Conference by Nina Viviani. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Oder)(Alexander, William)
March 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 22 JOINT STATUS REPORT AND DISCOVERY PLAN by Plaintiff Nina Viviani. (Alexander, William)
March 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 21 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Coffey and Associates Inc . (Rainey, Robert)
March 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ENTER ORDER (Text Only) - A review of the filings in this case reveals that Defendant Coffey and Associates Inc. has not filed a Corporate Disclosure Statement in compliance with Rule 7.1 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Accordingly, the Court hereby DIRECTS Defendant Coffey and Associates Inc. to file within 7 days of this order its Corporate Disclosure Statement pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, using the form available on the Courts website (http://www.okwd.uscourts.gov/wp-content/uploads/Corporate_Disclosure_Form.pdf). (This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this entry). Signed by Judge Patrick R Wyrick on 3/21/2022. (ks)
March 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 MOTION to Dismiss Defendants' Counterclaims and Brief in Support by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Proposed Order for Plaintiff's Motion to Dismiss Defendants' Counterclaims & Brief in Support)(McIntyre, Noble)
March 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ENTRY of Appearance by Pat Kirch on behalf of CY Coffey, Coffey and Associates Inc (Kirch, Pat)
March 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ENTRY of Appearance by Shane Riddles-Hill on behalf of CY Coffey, Coffey and Associates Inc (Riddles-Hill, Shane)
March 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ENTRY of Appearance by Austin W Anderson on behalf of Nina Viviani (Anderson, Austin)
March 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ENTRY of Appearance by William C Alexander on behalf of Nina Viviani (Alexander, William)
March 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ENTRY of Appearance by Carter T Hastings on behalf of Nina Viviani (Hastings, Carter)
March 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #9 , #10 and #11 Motions to Appear Pro Hac Vice; Austin W. Anderson, Carter T. Hastings and William Clifton Alexander are admitted to practice before this Court for the limited purpose of participating in this case on behalf of Plaintiff, provided each counsel becomes properly registered and files an entry of appearance, consistent with LCvR 83.4. Signed by Judge Patrick R Wyrick on 3/9/2022. (ks)
March 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 APRIL STATUS AND SCHEDULING CONFERENCE DOCKET: Scheduling Conference set for 4/5/2022 10:10 AM in Chambers before Judge Patrick R Wyrick. Status Report due by 3/29/2022. (ks)
March 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for William Clifton Alexander Filing fee $ 50, receipt number AOKWDC-3865420 by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - Request for Admission Pro Hac Vice for William Clifton Alexander, #2 Attachment Proposed Order Granting Plaintiffs' Motion for Pro Hac Vice for William Clifton Alexander)(McIntyre, Noble)
March 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Carter T. Hastings Filing fee $ 50, receipt number AOKWDC-3865401 by Nina Viviani. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - Request for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Carter T. Hastings, #2 Attachment Proposed Order Granting Plaintiffs' Motion for Pro Hac Vice for Carter T. Hastings)(McIntyre, Noble)
March 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Austin W. Anderson Filing fee $ 50, receipt number AOKWDC-3865380 by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Request for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Austin W. Anderson, #2 Attachment Proposed Order Granting Plaintiffs' Motion for Pro Hac Vice for Austin W. Anderson)(McIntyre, Noble)
February 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand , COUNTERCLAIM against Nina Viviani by Coffey and Associates Inc, CY Coffey.(Rainey, Robert)
February 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ENTRY of Appearance by Robert L Rainey on behalf of CY Coffey, Coffey and Associates Inc (Rainey, Robert)
February 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Nina Viviani. CY Coffey served on 2/7/2022. (McIntyre, Noble)
February 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Nina Viviani. Coffey and Associates Inc served on 2/7/2022. (McIntyre, Noble)
February 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ENTRY of Appearance by Jeremy A Thurman on behalf of Nina Viviani (Thurman, Jeremy)
February 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ENTRY of Appearance by Noble K McIntyre on behalf of Nina Viviani (McIntyre, Noble)
February 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Summons Issued Electronically as to CY Coffey, Coffey and Associates Inc. (dtb)
February 1, 2022 Opinion or Order PAYMENT FOR A CIVIL CASE Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AOKWDC-3843801. (McIntyre, Noble)
January 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Nina Viviani. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(dtb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Viviani v. Coffey and Associates Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nina Viviani
Represented By: Austin W Anderson
Represented By: Carter T Hastings
Represented By: Noble K McIntyre
Represented By: Jeremy A Thurman
Represented By: William C Alexander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Coffey and Associates Inc
Represented By: Pat Kirch
Represented By: Robert L Rainey
Represented By: Shane Riddles-Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CY Coffey
Represented By: Pat Kirch
Represented By: Robert L Rainey
Represented By: Shane Riddles-Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?