Rattler-Bryceland et al v. Boutchantharaj Corporation
Plaintiff: Diana Rattler-Bryceland and Phillip Randall Hampton
Defendant: Boutchantharaj Corporation doing business as DFW Security Protective Force
Case Number: 5:2022cv00106
Filed: February 4, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: David L Russell
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 4, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 4, 2022 Filing 10 RESPONSE in Opposition re #8 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and to Stay with Brief in Support filed by Phillip Randall Hampton, Diana Rattler-Bryceland. (Gillespie, Joseph)
March 14, 2022 Filing 9 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Boutchantharaj Corporation . (Whatley, Nathan)
March 14, 2022 Filing 8 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and to Stay with Brief in Support by Boutchantharaj Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit William Gregory Declaration, #2 Exhibit Collective Bargaining Agreement)(Whatley, Nathan)
March 14, 2022 Filing 7 ENTRY of Appearance by Nathan L Whatley on behalf of Boutchantharaj Corporation (Whatley, Nathan)
March 4, 2022 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Diana Rattler-Bryceland, Phillip Randall Hampton. Boutchantharaj Corporation served on 2/28/2022. (Gillespie, Joseph)
February 28, 2022 Filing 5 AMENDED COMPLAINT (First Amended) against Boutchantharaj Corporation filed by Diana Rattler-Bryceland, Phillip Randall Hampton. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1: Additional Opt-in Forms)(Gillespie, Joseph)
February 28, 2022 NOTICE from the Court that #4 Amended Complaint is STRICKEN due to counsel's failure to comply with ECF Policies & Procedures Manual, Section II(A)(4)(a). (kmt)
February 25, 2022 Filing 4 STRICKEN AMENDED COMPLAINT (First Amended Complaint) against Boutchantharaj Corporation filed by Diana Rattler-Bryceland, Phillip Randall Hampton. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Gillespie, Joseph) Modified on 2/28/2022 (kmt).
February 17, 2022 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Diana Rattler-Bryceland, Phillip Randall Hampton. Boutchantharaj Corporation served on 2/16/2022. (Gillespie, Joseph)
February 11, 2022 Filing 2 Summons Issued Electronically as to Boutchantharaj Corporation. (kmt)
February 8, 2022 Receipt for Money Received from Phillip Randall Hampton, Diana Rattler-Bryceland in the amount of $402.00, receipt number AOKWDC-3846551 regarding #1 Complaint (kmt)
February 4, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Boutchantharaj Corporation filed by Diana Rattler-Bryceland, Phillip Randall Hampton. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Consent Forms of Opt-in Plaintiffs, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(kmt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rattler-Bryceland et al v. Boutchantharaj Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Diana Rattler-Bryceland
Represented By: George J McCaffrey
Represented By: Joseph H Gillespie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Phillip Randall Hampton
Represented By: George J McCaffrey
Represented By: Joseph H Gillespie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Boutchantharaj Corporation doing business as DFW Security Protective Force
Represented By: Nathan L Whatley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?