Gerhart v. Bennett
Plaintiff: Albert G Gerhart
Defendant: John Robert Bennett
Case Number: 5:2022cv00124
Filed: February 11, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Bernard M Jones
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 28, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER ~ Based on the foregoing, and resolving any doubt against removal and finding no diversity or other grounds for federal question jurisdiction, this matter is REMANDED to the District Court of Oklahoma County, as more fully set out in the Order. Signed by Judge Bernard M. Jones on 2/28/2022. (dwl)
February 25, 2022 Filing 3 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE filed by John Robert Bennett. (Alderson, R)
February 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ~ Defendant is ordered to show cause on or before February 25, 2022, why the matter should not be remanded for lack of jurisdiction. Signed by Judge Bernard M. Jones on 2/15/2022. (dwl)
February 14, 2022 PAYMENT FOR A CIVIL CASE Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AOKWDC-3850775. (Hillis, R)
February 11, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Oklahoma County District Court, case number CJ-2021-3992 filed by John Robert Bennett. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - OK County Court Docket, #2 Exhibit 2 - 21-09-21 Petition, #3 Exhibit 3 - 21-09-21 COM - Steve Curry, #4 Exhibit 4 - 21-09-21 COM - Shane Jemison, #5 Exhibit 5 - 21-09-21 COM - Pam Pollard, #6 Exhibit 6 - 21-09-21 COM - John Bennett, #7 Exhibit 7 - 21-09-22 EOA by Anthony Ferate, #8 Exhibit 8 - 21-09-23 Returned Summons - OKGOP, #9 Exhibit 9 - 21-09-24 Motion to Disqualify Counsel, #10 Exhibit 10 - 21-09-28 Motion for Temporary Injunction, #11 Exhibit 11 - 21-09-28 Brief in Support of Motion for Temporary Injunction, #12 Exhibit 12 - 21-09-28 Exhibits Motion for Temp Injunction, #13 Exhibit 13 - 21-09-28 Green Card - Steve Curry, #14 Exhibit 14 - 21-09-29 Notice of Hearing (Disqualification), #15 Exhibit 15 - 21-09-29 Notice of Hearing (Injunction), #16 Exhibit 16 - 21-10-01 Green Card - John Bennett, #17 Exhibit 17 - 21-10-04 Green Card - Shane Jemison, #18 Exhibit 18 - 21-10-06 OKGOP Special EOA (Alderson), #19 Exhibit 18 - 21-10-06 OKGOP Special EOA (Duncan), #20 Exhibit 19 - 21-10-06 Special EOAppearance (Hillis), #21 Exhibit 20 - 21-10-06 OKGOP Response to Plf's Motion for Temp Inj, #22 Exhibit 21 - 21-10-06 Response to Pltf's Motion for Temp Inj, #23 Exhibit 22 - 21-10-07 2nd Brief for Motion Motion for Temporary Injunction Draft, #24 Exhibit 23 - 21-10-11 Defs OKGOP and Bennett Motion to Dismiss, #25 Exhibit 24 - 21-10-12 Answer to Reply to the Temp Injunction, #26 Exhibit 25 - 21-10-13 Court Minute, #27 Exhibit 26 - 21-10-13 Partial Transcript of Proceedings, #28 Exhibit 27 - 21-10-15 Green Card - Pam Pollard, #29 Exhibit 28 - 21-10-20 Receipt Notice of Filing, #30 Exhibit 29 - 21-11-12 Pltfs Motion to Reconsider and Brief in Support, #31 Exhibit 30 - 21-11-12 Pltfs Brief in Support of Motion to Reconsider, #32 Exhibit 31 - 21-11-12 Pltfs Motion for Dismissal with Prejudice, #33 Exhibit 32 - 21-12-07, #34 Exhibit 33 - 21-12-07 Motion to Settle Journal Entry of Judgment, #35 Exhibit 34 -21-12-20 Response to Def's Motion for Temp Injunction MTD, #36 Exhibit 35 - 21-12-22 Reply to MTD, #37 Exhibit 36 - 21-12-27 Aff of David Van Rissenghem, #38 Exhibit 37 - 21-12-27 Pltfs Answer to Defs 12-7 Answer to Motion, #39 Exhibit 38 - 21-12-27 Pltfs Response to Defs Motion to Dismiss, #40 Exhibit 39 - 21-12-28 JE of Judgment Denying Plfs Temp Injunctions, #41 Exhibit 40 - JE of Judgment Granting Defs Motion to Dismiss, #42 Exhibit 41 - 21-12-28 Order Granting Pltfs Motion to Dismiss, #43 Exhibit 42 - 22-01-14 Pltfs Amended Petition, #44 Exhibit 43 - 22-02-02 Motion to Dismiss, #45 Civil Cover Sheet)(km)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gerhart v. Bennett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Albert G Gerhart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Robert Bennett
Represented By: R Kyle Alderson
Represented By: R Tom Hillis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?