JR Relf Family LLC v. Relf et al
Plaintiff: JR Relf Family LLC
Defendant: Donald Relf, Carolyn Relf, Bobbie Thomas and Donald Thomas
Case Number: 5:2022cv00229
Filed: March 21, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Charles Goodwin
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18 U.S.C. ยง 1961 Racketeering (RICO) Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 11, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 11, 2022 Filing 7 AMENDED DOCUMENT by All Defendants. Amendment to #4 MOTION to Dismiss and Brief in Support . (Lane, Patrick)
April 7, 2022 Filing 6 ENTRY of Appearance by Jordan M LePage on behalf of All Defendants (LePage, Jordan)
April 7, 2022 Filing 5 ENTRY of Appearance by Grant Patrick Scowden on behalf of All Defendants (Scowden, Grant)
March 28, 2022 Filing 4 MOTION to Dismiss and Brief in Support by All Defendants. (Lane, Patrick)
March 28, 2022 Filing 3 ENTRY of Appearance by Patrick H Lane on behalf of All Defendants (Lane, Patrick)
March 24, 2022 Filing 2 Receipt for Money Received from All Defendants in the amount of $402.00, receipt number OKW500089766 regarding #1 Notice of Removal. (jjs)
March 21, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from District Court of Oklahoma County, case number CJ-2022-774 filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Petition, #2 Exhibit 2 - Entry of Appearance for Plaintiff, #3 Exhibit 3 - Returned Summons - Donald Relf, #4 Exhibit 4 - Returned Summons - Donald Thomas, #5 Exhibit 5 - Returned Summons - Bobbie Thomas, #6 Exhibit 6 - Returned Summons - Carolyn Relf, #7 Exhibit 7 - Entry of Appearance and Reservation of Time for Defendants Donald Relf & Donald Thomas, #8 Exhibit 8 - Entry of Appearance and Reservation of Time for Defendants Carolyn Relf & Bobbie Thomas, #9 Exhibit 9 - State Court Docket Sheet, #10 Civil Cover Sheet)(jjs)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: JR Relf Family LLC v. Relf et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JR Relf Family LLC
Represented By: Lewis A Berkowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald Relf
Represented By: Grant P Scowden
Represented By: Jordan M LePage
Represented By: Patrick H Lane
Represented By: Grant Patrick Scowden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carolyn Relf
Represented By: Grant P Scowden
Represented By: Jordan M LePage
Represented By: Patrick H Lane
Represented By: Grant Patrick Scowden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bobbie Thomas
Represented By: Grant P Scowden
Represented By: Jordan M LePage
Represented By: Patrick H Lane
Represented By: Grant Patrick Scowden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald Thomas
Represented By: Grant P Scowden
Represented By: Jordan M LePage
Represented By: Patrick H Lane
Represented By: Grant Patrick Scowden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?