Dean v. Progressive Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: Arerell Dean
Defendant: Progressive Insurance Company and Progressive Direct Insurance Company
Case Number: 5:2022cv00385
Filed: May 10, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Joe Heaton
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Account Receivable
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 20, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 SCHEDULING ORDER: Motions in limine due 05/15/2023; Jury instructions due 05/15/2023; Voir dire requests due 05/15/2023; Trial briefs due 05/15/2023; Discovery due by 3/1/2023. Jury Trial set on the court's 06/2023 trial docket set in Courtroom 501 before Judge Joe Heaton. Motions due by 3/15/2023. Pretrial Report due by 5/15/2023.Signed by Judge Joe Heaton on 07/20/2022. (lam)
July 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER striking the 08/10/2022 scheduling conference...see separate scheduling order for specific deadlines and trial date. Signed by Judge Joe Heaton on 07/20/2022. (lam)
July 20, 2022 Filing 15 STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice as to Defendant, Progressive Insurance Company, ONLY (Joint) by Progressive Direct Insurance Company. (Roberson, Brad)
July 18, 2022 Filing 14 JOINT STATUS REPORT AND DISCOVERY PLAN by Defendant Progressive Direct Insurance Company. (Roberson, Brad)
July 14, 2022 Filing 13 NOTICE of Subpoena by Progressive Direct Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - OnCue, #2 Exhibit 2 - Loves Travel Stop, #3 Exhibit 3 - Cavender Ford of OKC, #4 Exhibit 4 - Metro Ford of OKC, #5 Exhibit 5 - Tinker Federal Credit Union, #6 Exhibit 6 - Take 5 Oil Change, #7 Exhibit 7 - Sawgrass Ford, #8 Exhibit 8 - Ten Minute Oil Change #4, #9 Exhibit 9 - Westway Ford, #10 Exhibit 10 - Bigstick Motorsports, #11 Exhibit 11 - Mac Haik Ford DeSoto)(Roberson, Brad)
July 12, 2022 Filing 12 CIVIL SCHEDULING CONFERENCE DOCKET: Scheduling Conference set for 08/10/2022 @ 10:20 AM in Chambers before Judge Joe Heaton. Joint Status Report and Joint Discovery Plan due by 08/01/2022. (lam)
June 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER denying plaintiff's #8 motion to remand...defendant has established that the amount in controversy plausibly exceeds the jurisdictional limit of $75,000.00. Signed by Judge Joe Heaton on 6/27/2022. (cla)
June 8, 2022 Filing 10 RESPONSE to Motion re #8 MOTION to Remand (and objection) filed by Progressive Direct Insurance Company. (Neighbors, Zachary)
June 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ENTER ORDER the 07/02/2022 scheduling conference is STRICKEN pending the disposition of plaintiff's motion to remand filed 05/20/2022 #8 . Signed by Judge Joe Heaton on 06/08/2022. (lam)
May 20, 2022 Filing 8 MOTION to Remand by Arerell Dean. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Petition)(Flesch, Dane)
May 17, 2022 Filing 7 CIVIL SCEDULING CONFERENCE DOCKET: Scheduling Conference is set for 07/06/2022 @ 10:40 AM in Chambers before Judge Joe Heaton. Joint Status Report and Joint Discovery Plan due by 06/27/2022. (lam)
May 12, 2022 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint by Progressive Direct Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Dec Page; Policy & Endorsements)(Roberson, Brad)
May 11, 2022 Filing 5 ENTRY of Appearance by Zachary L Neighbors on behalf of Progressive Direct Insurance Company (Neighbors, Zachary)
May 11, 2022 Filing 4 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Progressive Direct Insurance Company . (Roberson, Brad)
May 11, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Progressive Direct Insurance Company re #1 Notice of Removal,, (Roberson, Brad)
May 11, 2022 Filing 2 ENTRY of Appearance by Brad L Roberson on behalf of Progressive Direct Insurance Company (Roberson, Brad)
May 11, 2022 PAYMENT FOR A CIVIL CASE Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AOKWDC-3907183. (Roberson, Brad)
May 10, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from District Court of Oklahoma County, case number CJ-2022-1786 filed by Progressive Direct Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - OSCN Details, #2 Exhibit 2 - Petition, #3 Exhibit 3 - EOA for Plf, #4 Exhibit 4 - Summons Served - Prog, #5 Exhibit 5 - Dec Page, #6 Exhibit 6 - PDIC Annual State, #7 Exhibit 7 - Harris v Prog Judgment, #8 Exhibit 8 - Harris v Plf's App4Atty Fees, #9 Exhibit 9 - Harris v. Prog Order re App4Atty Fees, #10 Exhibit Hambleton v Canal Order, #11 Civil Cover Sheet)(jjs)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dean v. Progressive Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arerell Dean
Represented By: Dane J Flesch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Progressive Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Progressive Direct Insurance Company
Represented By: Brad L Roberson
Represented By: Zachary L Neighbors
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?