Wood v. Stuart C Irby Company
Plaintiff: Chris C Wood doing business as CCW Electric
Defendant: Stuart C Irby Company a Mississippi Company doing business as Irby
Counter Defendant: Chris C Wood
Counter Claimant: Stuart C Irby Company
Case Number: 5:2022cv00387
Filed: May 11, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Scott L Palk
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 13, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 13, 2022 Filing 8 RESPONSE in Opposition re #5 MOTION to Remand filed by Stuart C Irby Company. (Kimball, Brian)
May 31, 2022 Filing 7 ENTRY of Appearance by George H Brown on behalf of Chris C Wood (Brown, George)
May 31, 2022 Filing 6 ANSWER to #4 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), Counterclaim,, by Chris C Wood.(Brown, George)
May 23, 2022 Filing 5 MOTION to Remand by Chris C Wood. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-Petition)(Brown, George)
May 18, 2022 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) AND, COUNTERCLAIM against Chris C Wood, Chris C. Wood, individually by Stuart C Irby Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Agreement, #2 Exhibit 2 - Material Invoices, #3 Exhibit 3 - Invoice Summary, #4 Exhibit 4 - Sales Terms)(Gregory, Haley)
May 18, 2022 Filing 3 ENTRY of Appearance by Haley F Gregory on behalf of Stuart C Irby Company (Gregory, Haley)
May 13, 2022 Filing 2 ENTRY of Appearance by Henry D Hoss on behalf of Stuart C Irby Company (Hoss, Henry)
May 11, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Oklahoma County District Court, case number CJ-2022-1856 filed by Stuart C Irby Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Petition, #2 Exhibit 2 - All process served upon Irby, #3 Exhibit 3 - State Court Docket Sheet, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(rr)
May 11, 2022 PAYMENT FOR A CIVIL CASE Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AOKWDC-3907223. (Kimball, Brian)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wood v. Stuart C Irby Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chris C Wood doing business as CCW Electric
Represented By: Henry D Hoss
Represented By: Brittney Marie Flesch
Represented By: Dane J Flesch
Represented By: George H Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stuart C Irby Company a Mississippi Company doing business as Irby
Represented By: Brian C Kimball
Represented By: Henry D Hoss
Represented By: Haley F Gregory
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Chris C Wood
Represented By: Brittney Marie Flesch
Represented By: Dane J Flesch
Represented By: George H Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: Stuart C Irby Company
Represented By: Brian C Kimball
Represented By: Henry D Hoss
Represented By: Haley F Gregory
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?