McArthur v. GEO Group Inc
Plaintiff: John McArthur
Defendant: GEO Group Inc
Case Number: 5:2022cv00402
Filed: May 17, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Timothy D DeGiusti
Referring Judge: Amanda Maxfield Green
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 15, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER adopting Report and Recommendations re #6 Report and Recommendation.; denying #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Filing fee due on or before 8/8/2022. Signed by Chief Judge Timothy D. DeGiusti on 7/15/2022. (mb)
June 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER re #7 Letter. Upon consideration, the court grants plaintiff's request for an extension of time. Any objection to the Report and Recommendation shall be filed by July 11, 2022. Signed by Chief Judge Timothy D. DeGiusti on 6/16/2022. (kmt)
June 13, 2022 Filing 7 LETTER from John McArthur (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (kmt)
May 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. The undersigned recommends that the court deny Plaintiff's Application for Leave to Proceed IFP (Doc. 2). The undersigned further recommends that if Plaintiff does not pay the $402.00 filing fee in full to the Clerk of the Court within 21 days of any order adopting this Report and Recommendation, that this action be dismissed without prejudice to the refiling. Objections to R&R due by 6/10/2022. This Report and Recommendation terminates the referral of this matter to the undersigned. Signed by Magistrate Judge Amanda Maxfield Green on 5/20/2022. (rb)
May 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER to Cure Deficiencies. Signed by Magistrate Judge Amanda Maxfield Green on 5/20/2022. (rb)
May 18, 2022 Filing 4 ENTER ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Amanda Maxfield Green. Motions referred to Amanda Maxfield Green. Signed by the direction of Chief Judge Timothy D. DeGiusti on 5/18/2022. (kmt)
May 18, 2022 Filing 3 NO PREVIOUS Cases (kmt)
May 18, 2022 Notice of Mailing LCvR5.4/Change of Address form, #1 Complaint, #4 Enter Order to : John McArthur #68894-112 EDGEFIELD-FCI P O Box 725 Edgefield, SC 29824 (kmt)
May 17, 2022 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by John McArthur. (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1 - Service Documents, #2 Envelope)(kmt)
May 17, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against GEO Group Inc filed by John McArthur. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(kmt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McArthur v. GEO Group Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John McArthur
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GEO Group Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?