Cartessa Aesthetics LLC v. Lorents
Plaintiff: Cartessa Aesthetics LLC
Defendant: Ed Lorents
Case Number: 5:2022cv00454
Filed: June 3, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Patrick R Wyrick
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 27, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #19 Motion for Leave for Counsel to Appear by Telephone (as more fully set out in order). Signed by Judge Patrick R Wyrick on 07/27/2022. (so)
July 27, 2022 Filing 19 MOTION for Leave for Counsel to Appear by Telephone by Cartessa Aesthetics LLC. (Whitmire, Lyndon)
July 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #17 the parties' Joint Application for Entry of Clawback Order (as more fully set out in the order). Signed by Judge Patrick R Wyrick on 7/26/2022. (ks)
July 26, 2022 Filing 17 JOINT MOTION for Order (Entry of Clawback Order) by Cartessa Aesthetics LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Privilege Non-Waiver Agreement - Clawback Agreement)(Whitmire, Lyndon)
July 26, 2022 Filing 16 JOINT STATUS REPORT AND DISCOVERY PLAN by Plaintiff Cartessa Aesthetics LLC. (Whitmire, Lyndon)
July 18, 2022 Filing 15 REPLY by Plaintiff Cartessa Aesthetics LLC re #12 Answer to Complaint / Disclaimer, Counterclaim filed by Cartessa Aesthetics LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Financial Document)(Whitmire, Lyndon)
June 30, 2022 Filing 14 AUGUST STATUS AND SCHEDULING CONFERENCE DOCKET: Scheduling Conference set for 8/2/2022 09:50 AM in Chambers before Judge Patrick R Wyrick. Status Report due by 7/26/2022. (ks)
June 28, 2022 Filing 13 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Ed Lorents. (Scimeca, Peter)
June 27, 2022 Filing 12 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand , COUNTERCLAIM against Cartessa Aesthetics LLC by Ed Lorents.(Scimeca, Peter)
June 27, 2022 Filing 11 ENTRY of Appearance by Peter L Scimeca on behalf of Ed Lorents (Scimeca, Peter)
June 27, 2022 Filing 10 ENTRY of Appearance by Peter L Scimeca on behalf of Ed Lorents (Scimeca, Peter)
June 14, 2022 Filing 9 ENTRY of Appearance by Lauren Bernstein on behalf of Cartessa Aesthetics LLC (Bernstein, Lauren) Modified on 6/17/2022, document flattened (so).
June 14, 2022 Filing 8 ENTRY of Appearance by Robert M Tils on behalf of Cartessa Aesthetics LLC (Tils, Robert) Modified on 6/17/2022, document flattened (so).
June 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #5 and #6 Motions to Appear Pro Hac Vice; Robert M. Tils and Lauren Bernstein are admitted to practice before this Court for the limited purpose of participating in this case on behalf of Defendant, provided each counsel becomes properly registered and files an entry of appearance, consistent with LCvR 83.4. Signed by Judge Patrick R Wyrick on 6/10/2022. (ks)
June 9, 2022 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Lauren Bernstein Filing fee $ 50, receipt number AOKWDC-3925417 by Cartessa Aesthetics LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Request for Admission Pro Hac Vice - Bernstein)(Whitmire, Lyndon)
June 9, 2022 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Robert M. Tils Filing fee $ 50, receipt number AOKWDC-3925381 by Cartessa Aesthetics LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Request for Admission Pro Hac Vice - Tils)(Whitmire, Lyndon)
June 3, 2022 Filing 4 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - LLC by Cartessa Aesthetics LLC (Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement and LCvR 7.1.1 Disclosure Identifying Constituents of Limited Liability Company). (Whitmire, Lyndon)
June 3, 2022 Filing 3 ENTRY of Appearance by Lyndon W Whitmire on behalf of Cartessa Aesthetics LLC (Whitmire, Lyndon)
June 3, 2022 Filing 2 Summons Issued Electronically as to Ed Lorents. (so)
June 3, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Ed Lorents filed by Cartessa Aesthetics LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Purchase Agreements, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(so)
June 3, 2022 PAYMENT FOR A CIVIL CASE Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AOKWDC-3921266. (Whitmire, Lyndon)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cartessa Aesthetics LLC v. Lorents
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cartessa Aesthetics LLC
Represented By: Lauren M Bernstein
Represented By: Robert M Tils
Represented By: Lyndon W Whitmire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ed Lorents
Represented By: Peter L Scimeca
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?