Hunter v. Oklahoma State of et al
Plaintiff: Todd J E Hunter
Defendant: Oklahoma State of, Payne County District Court, Payne County Department Human Services and Payne County Bar Association
Case Number: 5:2022cv00457
Filed: June 3, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Bernard M Jones
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 15, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 15, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE (other) titled, "Demand" by Todd J E Hunter (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(km)
June 15, 2022 Filing 6 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Todd J E Hunter. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(km)
June 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 JUDGMENT ~ In accordance with the Court's order entered on this date, this action is dismissed. Signed by Judge Bernard M. Jones on 6/9/2022. (dwl)
June 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER ~ Having carefully reviewed the Claim/Complaint/Cause of Action, the Court finds that the Claim/Complaint/Cause of Action should be dismissed under 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2)(B)(ii), as it fails to state a claim for relief. This action is hereby DISMISSED. Signed by Judge Bernard M. Jones on 6/9/2022. (dwl)
June 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER ~ Granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Plaintiff, therefore, is authorized to proceed without prepayment of the fees or giving security for such payment. Signed by Judge Bernard M. Jones on 6/7/2022. (dwl)
June 3, 2022 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Todd J E Hunter. (km)
June 3, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Oklahoma State of, Payne County Bar Association, Payne County Department Human Services, Payne County District Court filed by Todd J E Hunter. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Warning Label on Baby Formula, #2 Exhibit 2 - Documents With and Without State of Oklahoma County of Payne Clerk Seal, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(km)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hunter v. Oklahoma State of et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Todd J E Hunter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oklahoma State of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Payne County District Court
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Payne County Department Human Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Payne County Bar Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?