Fallon v. Doe et al
Plaintiff: John M Fallon and Matt Fallon
Defendant: Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, John Doe and Safeco Insurance
Case Number: 5:2022cv00473
Filed: June 8, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Joe Heaton
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Insurance Contract
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 23, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ADMINISTRATIVE CLOSING ORDER: This action is administratively terminated without prejudice to the rights of the parties to reopen for entry of any stipulation or order. If not reopened within 45 days to obtain final determination, action is deemed dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge Joe Heaton on 06/23/2022. (lam)
June 21, 2022 Filing 6 ENTRY of Appearance by Shawn D Fulkerson on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Fulkerson, Shawn)
June 15, 2022 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss by Liberty Mutual Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1: Insurance Policy)(O'Connor, William)
June 15, 2022 Filing 4 ENTRY of Appearance by William W O'Connor on behalf of Liberty Mutual Insurance Company (O'Connor, William)
June 15, 2022 Filing 3 ENTRY of Appearance by Kristen P Evans on behalf of Liberty Mutual Insurance Company (Evans, Kristen)
June 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ENTER ORDER counsel for the parties are directed to file their entries of appearance not later than 06/15/2022. Signed by Judge Joe Heaton on 06/13/2022. (lam)
June 10, 2022 PAYMENT FOR A CIVIL CASE Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AOKWDC-3926561. (O'Connor, William)
June 8, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from District Court of Cleveland County, case number CJ-2022-465 filed by Liberty Mutual Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Docket, #2 Exhibit 2 - Petition, #3 Exhibit 3 - Summons to LM, #4 Exhibit 4 - EOA of S. Fulkerson, #5 Exhibit 5 - ROS_Summons to LM, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(jjs)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fallon v. Doe et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John M Fallon
Represented By: Shawn D Fulkerson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matt Fallon
Represented By: Shawn D Fulkerson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Liberty Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By: Kristen P Evans
Represented By: William W O'Connor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Safeco Insurance
Represented By: Kristen P Evans
Represented By: William W O'Connor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?