Karter and Kohl Enterprises LLC v. Pro Tec Inc et al
Plaintiff: Karter and Kohl Enterprises LLC
Defendant: Pro Tec Inc and Palwinder Singh
Case Number: 5:2022cv00476
Filed: June 9, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: David L Russell
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Property Damage
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 2, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SCHEDULING Order: Motions to amend due 45 day from today; Motions in limine due 3/1/23; Jury instructions due 3/1/23; Voir dire requests due 3/1/23; Discovery due by 2/2/2023. Jury Trial set for 3/14/2023 09:00 AM in Courtroom 302 before Judge David L. Russell. Motions due by 1/3/2023. Pretrial Report due by 3/1/2023.. Signed by Judge David L. Russell on 8/2/22. (jw)
July 27, 2022 Filing 6 JOINT STATUS REPORT AND DISCOVERY PLAN by Defendants Pro Tec Inc, Palwinder Singh. (Norman, Robert)
July 27, 2022 Filing 5 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Pro Tec Inc . (Norman, Robert)
June 29, 2022 Filing 4 DOCKET: Scheduling Conference set for 8/2/2022 10:15 AM via conference call before Judge David L. Russell. Status Report due by 7/27/2022. (jw) (Main Document 4 replaced on 6/30/2022) (jw).
June 21, 2022 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by All Defendants.(Norman, Robert)
June 10, 2022 PAYMENT FOR A CIVIL CASE Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AOKWDC-3926201. (Norman, Robert)
June 9, 2022 Filing 2 ENTRY of Appearance by Robert E Norman on behalf of All Defendants (Norman, Robert)
June 9, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from District Court of Beckham County, case number CJ-2022-58 filed by Pro Tec Inc, Palwinder Singh. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - OSCN Docket Sheet, #2 Exhibit 2 - Petition, #3 Exhibit 3 - Pltf's EOA, #4 Exhibit 4 - Summons to Pro Tec, #5 Exhibit 5 - Summons to Singh, #6 Exhibit 6 - Pro Tec EOA & Reservation, #7 Civil Cover Sheet)(kmt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Karter and Kohl Enterprises LLC v. Pro Tec Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karter and Kohl Enterprises LLC
Represented By: Jeff A Eulberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pro Tec Inc
Represented By: Robert E Norman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Palwinder Singh
Represented By: Robert E Norman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?