Stephens v. West Coast Life Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Julia Stephens
Defendant: West Coast Life Insurance Company
Case Number: 5:2022cv00479
Filed: June 13, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Jodi W Dishman
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Insurance Contract
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 9, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 9, 2022 Filing 9 REPLY to Response to Motion re #6 MOTION to Dismiss filed by West Coast Life Insurance Company. (Fischer, Amy)
August 2, 2022 Filing 8 RESPONSE in Opposition re #6 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Julia Stephens. (Hoover, Michael)
July 13, 2022 Filing 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by West Coast Life Insurance Company . (Fischer, Amy)
July 13, 2022 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss by West Coast Life Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-Marital Settlement Agreement, #2 Exhibit 2-Decree of Dissolution of Marriage)(Fischer, Amy)
July 13, 2022 Filing 5 ENTRY of Appearance by Amy Sherry Fischer on behalf of West Coast Life Insurance Company (Fischer, Amy)
July 12, 2022 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Julia Stephens. West Coast Life Insurance Company served on 6/21/2022. (Hoover, Michael)
June 16, 2022 Filing 3 ENTRY of Appearance by Hailey M Hopper on behalf of Julia Stephens (Hopper, Hailey)
June 13, 2022 Filing 2 Summons Issued Electronically as to West Coast Life Insurance Company. (km)
June 13, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against West Coast Life Insurance Company filed by Julia Stephens. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(km)
June 13, 2022 PAYMENT FOR A CIVIL CASE Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AOKWDC-3927650. (Hoover, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stephens v. West Coast Life Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julia Stephens
Represented By: Hailey M Hopper
Represented By: Michael J Hoover
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: West Coast Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Amy Sherry Fischer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?