Blake Prodution Company Inc v. Camino Natural Resources LLC
Plaintiff: Blake Prodution Company Inc
Defendant: Camino Natural Resources LLC
Case Number: 5:2022cv00590
Filed: July 14, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Patrick R Wyrick
Nature of Suit: Torts to Land
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Account Receivable
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 15, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 Defendant Camino Natural Resources, LLC's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond. Defendant is instructed to respond to Plaintiff's Complaint (Dkt. 1) no later than September 14, 2022. Signed by Judge Patrick R Wyrick on 8/15/2022. (ks)
August 15, 2022 Filing 6 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Camino Natural Resources LLC. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Proposed Order Granting Motion for Extension)(Holman, David)
August 15, 2022 Filing 5 ENTRY of Appearance by David C Holman on behalf of Camino Natural Resources LLC (Holman, David)
July 15, 2022 Filing 4 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Blake Prodution Company Inc . (Miller, Jennifer)
July 15, 2022 Filing 3 ENTRY of Appearance by Jennifer L Miller on behalf of Blake Prodution Company Inc (Miller, Jennifer)
July 15, 2022 Filing 2 Summons Issued Electronically as to Camino Natural Resources LLC. (so)
July 15, 2022 PAYMENT FOR A CIVIL CASE Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AOKWDC-3949450. (Miller, Jennifer)
July 14, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Camino Natural Resources LLC filed by Blake Prodution Company Inc. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(so)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Blake Prodution Company Inc v. Camino Natural Resources LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Blake Prodution Company Inc
Represented By: Jennifer L Miller
Represented By: Thomas G Wolfe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Camino Natural Resources LLC
Represented By: David C Holman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?