Brewer v. Doe et al
Plaintiff: Jesse A Brewer
Defendant: Jane Doe, John Doe and Heather Walker
Case Number: 5:2022cv00683
Filed: August 9, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Bernard M Jones
Referring Judge: Gary M Purcell
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 4, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER TO AGENCY HAVING CUSTODY OF PLAINTIFF FOR PAYMENT OF INMATE FILING FEE. See Order for further details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gary M. Purcell on 10/4/2022. (cps)
October 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER REQUIRING SERVICE AND SPECIAL REPORT. See Order for further details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gary M. Purcell on 10/4/2022. (cps) (Main Document 11 replaced on 10/4/2022) (cps).
September 30, 2022 Filing 10 Receipt for Money Received from Jesse A Brewer in the amount of $21.43, receipt number OKW500092235 regarding #1 Complaint. Remaining balance $328.57. Mailed receipt to Jesse A Brewer #53146-054 PINE KNOT-USPM P O Box 3000 Pine Knot, KY 42635 (ekw)
September 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ENTER ORDER granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to Pay Initial Partial Filing Fee. Plaintiff is given additional time until October 11th, 2022, to comply with the Court's Order entered on August 30, 2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gary M. Purcell on 9/20/2022. (cps)
September 19, 2022 Filing 8 MOTION for Extension of Time by Jesse A Brewer. Motions referred to Gary M. Purcell. (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1- Cover Letter, #2 Envelope)(dtb)
August 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The Court finds Plaintiff is entitled to proceed without full prepayment of the filing fee, and his motion is granted. However, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(b)(1), Plaintiff shall be required to pay the full $350 filing fee as set forth in this Order. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court shall not issue process until further order of the Court, and the Clerk shall send a copy of this Order to the agency having custody of Plaintiff. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gary M. Purcell on 8/30/2022. (cps)
August 29, 2022 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Jesse A Brewer. Motions referred to Gary M. Purcell. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Transaction List, #2 Attachment 1 - Cover Letter, #3 Envelope)(km)
August 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER TO CURE DEFICIENCY. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff shall cure the deficiencies designated above by the 2nd day of September, 2022. The Clerk of the Court is directed to mail to the Plaintiff along with this Order copies of the court-approved in forma pauperis form. Otherwise, the Court will recommend dismissal of this action without prejudice and without further notice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gary M. Purcell on 8/15/2022. (cps)
August 11, 2022 Filing 4 ENTER ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Gary M. Purcell. Motions referred to Gary M. Purcell. Signed by the direction of Judge Bernard M. Jones on 08/11/2022. (so)
August 11, 2022 Filing 3 NO PREVIOUS Cases (so)
August 11, 2022 Notice of Mailing LCvR5.4/Change of Address form, #1 , #2 , #4 , Jesse A Brewer #53146-054 PINE KNOT-USPM P O Box 3000 Pine Knot, KY 42635 (so)
August 9, 2022 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Jesse A Brewer. (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1 - Cover Letter, #2 Envelope)(so)
August 9, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Jesse A Brewer. (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1 - Cover Letter, #2 Envelope)(so)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brewer v. Doe et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jesse A Brewer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Heather Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?