Lefeber v. Cruickshank
Plaintiff: Richard Lefeber
Defendant: Eric Cruickshank
Case Number: 5:2022cv00799
Filed: September 9, 2022
Court: U.S. District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Joe Heaton
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201 Denial of Overtime Compensation
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 3, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 3, 2022 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Richard Lefeber. Eric Cruickshank served on 9/23/2022. (Qualls, Colby)
September 14, 2022 Filing 4 ENTRY of Appearance by Stephen D Bachman on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Bachman, Stephen)
September 13, 2022 PAYMENT FOR A CIVIL CASE Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AOKWDC-3991311. (Qualls, Colby)
September 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ENTER ORDER counsel for plaintiff is directed to file an entry of appearance by 09/15/2022...plaintiff is directed to comply with local counsel rule. Signed by Judge Joe Heaton on 09/12/2022. (lam)
September 9, 2022 Filing 2 Summons Issued Electronically as to Eric Cruickshank. (so)
September 9, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Eric Cruickshank filed by Richard Lefeber. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(so)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lefeber v. Cruickshank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Lefeber
Represented By: Colby Qualls
Represented By: Stephen D Bachman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric Cruickshank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?