Bointy et al v. Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Byron Bointy and Evelyn Bointy
Defendant: Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company
Case Number: 5:2022cv00872
Filed: October 5, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Scott L Palk
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Property Damage
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 28, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #9 Motion to Remand. Signed by Judge Scott L. Palk on 11/28/22. (ms)
November 23, 2022 Filing 12 JOINT STATUS REPORT AND DISCOVERY PLAN by Plaintiffs Byron Bointy, Evelyn Bointy. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Proposed Scheduling Order)(McIntyre, Noble)
November 22, 2022 Filing 11 REPLY to Response to Motion re #9 MOTION to Remand filed by All Plaintiffs. (McIntyre, Noble)
November 17, 2022 Filing 10 RESPONSE in Opposition re #9 MOTION to Remand filed by Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company. (Warner, Eric)
November 4, 2022 Filing 9 MOTION to Remand by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Proposed Order for Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand)(McIntyre, Noble)
October 27, 2022 Filing 8 TELEPHONIC STATUS/SCHEDULING CONFERENCE DOCKET: Scheduling Conference set for 12/1/2022 10:15 AM in before Judge Scott L. Palk. Status Report due by 11/23/2022. (ms)
October 13, 2022 Filing 7 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by All Plaintiffs. (McIntyre, Noble)
October 7, 2022 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company.(Molinsky, William)
October 6, 2022 Filing 5 ENTRY of Appearance by Jeremy A Thurman on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Thurman, Jeremy) Modified on 10/7/2022 to flatten document (rr).
October 6, 2022 Filing 4 ENTRY of Appearance by Noble K McIntyre on behalf of All Plaintiffs (McIntyre, Noble) Modified on 10/7/2022 to flatten document(rr).
October 5, 2022 Filing 3 ENTRY of Appearance by William J Molinsky, Jr on behalf of Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company (Molinsky, William)
October 5, 2022 Filing 2 ENTRY of Appearance by Eric Payson Warner on behalf of Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company (Warner, Eric)
October 5, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Comanche County District Court, case number CJ-2022-378 filed by Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Petition, #2 Exhibit 2 - Notice of Service, #3 Exhibit 3 - OSCN Details, #4 Exhibit 4 - Petition, #5 Exhibit 5 - 2022-08-26 - EOA, #6 Exhibit 6 - Summons, #7 Civil Cover Sheet)(rr)
October 5, 2022 PAYMENT FOR A CIVIL CASE Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AOKWDC-4005953. (Warner, Eric)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bointy et al v. Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Byron Bointy
Represented By: Jeremy A Thurman
Represented By: Noble K McIntyre
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Evelyn Bointy
Represented By: Jeremy A Thurman
Represented By: Noble K McIntyre
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company
Represented By: Eric Payson Warner
Represented By: William J Molinsky, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?