Horton v. Garland
Plaintiff: John D Horton
Defendant: Merrick Garland
Case Number: 5:2022cv00894
Filed: October 12, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Stephen P Friot
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2201 Declaratory Judgement
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 17, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 17, 2022 Filing 12 Tenth Circuit USCA Case Number 22-6193 for #8 Notice of Appeal filed by John D Horton. Civil case docketed. Preliminary record filed. DATE RECEIVED: 11/16/2022 Notice of appearance due on 12/19/2022 for John D. Horton. [22-6193] (rr)
November 17, 2022 Docket Annotation: Record on Appeal filed on 11/17/22 at Tenth Circuit in 22-6193. (rr)
November 16, 2022 Filing 11 PRELIMINARY RECORD LETTER - Electronic Transmission of Notice of Appeal with Preliminary Record sent to Tenth Circuit Court of Appeals re #8 Notice of Appeal (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1- Preliminary Record on Appeal)(dtb)
November 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER denying #9 Motion for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis. Signed by Judge Stephen P. Friot on 11/15/2022. (llg)
November 14, 2022 Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis by John D Horton. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(dtb)
November 14, 2022 Filing 8 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #7 Judgment, #6 Order Dismissing Case, by John D Horton. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(dtb)
October 20, 2022 Filing 7 JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Stephen P. Friot on 10/20/2022. (llg)
October 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER. #1 Plaintiff's Complaint for a Declaratory Judgment Regarding the Plaintiff's Second Amendment Constitutional Rights is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE for lack of jurisdiction. Signed by Judge Stephen P. Friot on 10/20/2022. (llg)
October 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Suzanne Mitchell on 10/18/2022. (cps)
October 14, 2022 Filing 4 ENTER ORDER re #1 Complaint filed by John D Horton. Plf requests that "all correspondence from this court and from the defendant be via scanned documents delivered via email to johndhorton@yahoo.com." The court GRANTS plf's request only to the extent that the Clerk is directed that any filings by the court will be emailed to plf at the email address provided: johndhorton@yahoo.com. The court advises the plf that, due to his pro se status, he is not entitled to file documents with the court electronically & must either mail them to the court or present them for filing in person. The Clerk is directed to email plf a copy of this Enter Order along with a copy of #3 10/14/2022 Enter Order at the email address indicated above. Entered at the direction of Judge Stephen P. Friot on 10/14/2022. (llg)
October 14, 2022 Filing 3 ENTER ORDER REFERRING MOTION: #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by John D Horton Motions referred to Suzanne Mitchell. Signed at the direction of Judge Stephen P. Friot on 10/14/22. (dtb)
October 12, 2022 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by John D Horton. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(dtb)
October 12, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Merrick Garland filed by John D Horton. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(dtb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Horton v. Garland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John D Horton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Merrick Garland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?