Blankenship et al v. Stitt et al
Plaintiff: John Hayden Blankenship, Haylee Blankenship, Delsie Mae Pye, Tasha Colleen Yates and Taranzo Lenard Pye
Defendant: John Kevin Stitt, Oklahoma Pardon and Parole Board, John or Jane Doe, Tom Bates, Edward Konieczny, Scott Williams, Cathy Stocker, Adam Luck, Kelly Doyle, C. Allen McCall, Larry Morris, Oklahoma Dept. of Corrections, Scott Crow, M.D. Ross Fisher, PH.D Janna Morgan, The Oklahoma Mental Health Council Inc a not for profit established under Oklahoma law doing business as Red Rock Behavioral Health Services, Vivian Hasbrook, Lawrence Paul Anderson, Richard Smothermon and Robert Gilliland
Case Number: 5:2022cv00958
Filed: November 4, 2022
Court: U.S. District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Patrick R Wyrick
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 22, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Summons Issued Electronically as to Lawrence Paul Anderson, Tom Bates, Scott Crow, Kelly Doyle(as former Board Member of Pardon and Parole Bd), Kelly Doyle(individually), Ross Fisher, Edward Konieczny, Adam Luck(individually ), Adam Luck(as former Board Member of Pardon and Parole Bd), C. Allen McCall(individually), C. Allen McCall(as former Board Member of Pardon and Parole Bd), Janna Morgan, Larry Morris(individually), Larry Morris(as former Board Member of Pardon and Parole Bd), Oklahoma Dept. of Corrections, Oklahoma Pardon and Parole Board, Richard Smothermon, John Kevin Stitt, Cathy Stocker, Scott Williams. (rr)
November 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ENTRY of Appearance by Steven E Holden on behalf of The Oklahoma Mental Health Council Inc (Holden, Steven)
November 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ENTRY of Appearance by Anita K Anthony on behalf of The Oklahoma Mental Health Council Inc (Anthony, Anita)
November 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ENTRY of Appearance by Dan L Holloway on behalf of Delsie Mae Pye(individually ), Delsie Mae Pye(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Leon W Pye; (DC Grady Co. PB-2022-19)), Taranzo Lenard Pye, Tasha Colleen Yates (Holloway, Dan)
November 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ENTRY of Appearance by Kenyatta R Bethea on behalf of Delsie Mae Pye(individually ), Delsie Mae Pye(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Leon W Pye; (DC Grady Co. PB-2022-19)), Taranzo Lenard Pye, Tasha Colleen Yates (Bethea, Kenyatta)
November 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ENTRY of Appearance by Robert J Wagner on behalf of Delsie Mae Pye(individually ), Delsie Mae Pye(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Leon W Pye; (DC Grady Co. PB-2022-19)), Taranzo Lenard Pye, Tasha Colleen Yates (Wagner, Robert)
November 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ENTRY of Appearance by Jon J Gores on behalf of Delsie Mae Pye(individually ), Delsie Mae Pye(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Leon W Pye; (DC Grady Co. PB-2022-19)), Taranzo Lenard Pye, Tasha Colleen Yates (Gores, Jon)
November 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ENTRY of Appearance by Timothy D Cain on behalf of Haylee Blankenship, John Hayden Blankenship (Cain, Timothy)
November 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 Notice of Tort Claim, #2 Exhibit 2 Anderson's 1st App. for Com., #3 Exhibit 3 Anderson's 2nd App. for Com., #4 Exhibit 4 PPB Report, #5 Exhibit 5 Oklahoma of 400 releases half re-arrested, #6 Exhibit 6 Certificate of Commutation, #7 Exhibit 7 OK PPB - Website on Commutations, #8 Exhibit 8 Resolution in Support and App of S Bickley)(Cain, Timothy)
November 7, 2022 Opinion or Order PAYMENT FOR A CIVIL CASE Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AOKWDC-4026842. (Cain, Timothy)
November 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Notice of Tort Claim, #2 Exhibit 2 - Anderson's 1st App. for Com., #3 Exhibit 3 - Anderson's 2nd App. for Comm, #4 Exhibit 4 - PPB Report, #5 Exhibit 5 - Oklahoma of 400 releases half re-arrested, #6 Exhibit 6 - Certificate of Commutation, #7 Exhibit 7 - OK PPB - Website on Commutations, #8 Exhibit 8 - Resolution in Support and App of S Bickley, #9 Civil Cover Sheet)(so)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Blankenship et al v. Stitt et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Hayden Blankenship
Represented By: David B Donchin
Represented By: Timothy D Cain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Haylee Blankenship
Represented By: David B Donchin
Represented By: Timothy D Cain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Delsie Mae Pye
Represented By: Dan L Holloway
Represented By: Jon J Gores
Represented By: Kenyatta R Bethea
Represented By: Robert J Wagner
Represented By: Timothy D Cain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tasha Colleen Yates
Represented By: Dan L Holloway
Represented By: Jon J Gores
Represented By: Kenyatta R Bethea
Represented By: Robert J Wagner
Represented By: Timothy D Cain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Taranzo Lenard Pye
Represented By: Dan L Holloway
Represented By: Jon J Gores
Represented By: Kenyatta R Bethea
Represented By: Robert J Wagner
Represented By: Timothy D Cain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Kevin Stitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oklahoma Pardon and Parole Board
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John or Jane Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tom Bates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edward Konieczny
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cathy Stocker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adam Luck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kelly Doyle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C. Allen McCall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larry Morris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oklahoma Dept. of Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Crow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M.D. Ross Fisher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PH.D Janna Morgan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Oklahoma Mental Health Council Inc a not for profit established under Oklahoma law doing business as Red Rock Behavioral Health Services
Represented By: Anita K Anthony
Represented By: Steven E Holden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vivian Hasbrook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lawrence Paul Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Smothermon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Gilliland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?