Clouston v. Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company
Plaintiff: William Clouston
Defendant: Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company
Case Number: 5:2022cv00975
Filed: November 10, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Scott L Palk
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Property Damage
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 4, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SCHEDULING ORDER Pursuant to the provisions of the Order for Status/Scheduling Conference filed herein, the Court has determined that a formal Status/Scheduling Conference is not necessary. The Status/Scheduling Conference scheduled for January 6, 2023, is hereby STRICKEN and the following scheduling deadlines are entered: Motions to join due 2/3/2023; Motions to amend due 2/3/2023; Pla expert witness list and expert reports due 7/3/2023; Dft expert witness list and expert reports due 7/14/2023; Pla witness list due 7/3/2023; Dft witness list due 7/14/2023; Pla exhibit list due 7/17/2023; Dft exhibit list due 7/24/2023; Stipulations due 9/1/2023; Motions in limine due 9/1/2023; Jury instructions due 9/1/2023; Voir dire requests due 9/1/2023; Trial briefs due 9/1/2023; ADR Completion Date due by 8/1/2023. Discovery due by 9/1/2023. Jury Trial set for 10/10/2023 09:30 AM in Courtroom 304 before Judge Scott L. Palk. Motions due by 8/1/2023. Pretrial Report due by 9/1/2023. Signed by Judge Scott L. Palk on 1/4/2023. (ms)
December 29, 2022 Filing 9 JOINT STATUS REPORT AND DISCOVERY PLAN by Plaintiff William Clouston. (Botizan, Madison)
December 7, 2022 Filing 8 TELEPHONIC STATUS/SCHEDULING CONFERENCE DOCKET: Scheduling Conference set for 1/6/2023 09:45 AM in Courtroom 304 before Judge Scott L. Palk. Status Report due by 12/29/2022. (ms)
November 14, 2022 Filing 7 ENTRY of Appearance by William J Molinsky, Jr on behalf of Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company (Molinsky, William)
November 14, 2022 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company.(Warner, Eric)
November 14, 2022 Filing 5 ENTRY of Appearance by Eric Payson Warner on behalf of Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company (Warner, Eric)
November 14, 2022 Filing 4 ENTRY of Appearance by Madison A Botizan on behalf of William Clouston (Botizan, Madison)
November 14, 2022 Filing 3 ENTRY of Appearance by Robert T Goolsby on behalf of William Clouston (Goolsby, Robert)
November 14, 2022 Filing 2 ENTRY of Appearance by David Proctor on behalf of William Clouston (Proctor, David)
November 14, 2022 PAYMENT FOR A CIVIL CASE Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AOKWDC-4029986. (Warner, Eric)
November 10, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Cleveland County District Court, case number CJ-2022-1166 filed by Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Petition, #2 Exhibit 2 - Notice of Service, #3 Exhibit 3 - OSCN Details, #4 Exhibit 4 - Petition, #5 Exhibit 5 - Notice of Service, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(rr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Clouston v. Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Clouston
Represented By: David Proctor
Represented By: Madison A Botizan
Represented By: Robert T Goolsby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company
Represented By: Eric Payson Warner
Represented By: William J Molinsky, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?