Taylor v. Juma et al
Plaintiff: Brittany C Taylor
Defendant: Thomas Matwetwe Juma and Roadpacer Transport Limited Co
Case Number: 5:2023cv00132
Filed: February 9, 2023
Court: U.S. District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Timothy D DeGiusti
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Tort/Motor Vehicle (P.I.)
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 27, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 NOTICE (other) by Brittany C Taylor Rule 26 Compliance (Carr, Michael)
March 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 JOINT STATUS REPORT AND DISCOVERY PLAN by Plaintiff Brittany C Taylor. (Carr, Michael)
March 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 NOTICE of Subpoena by Brittany C Taylor (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Subpoena Duces Tecum)(Carr, Michael)
February 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint by Thomas Matwetwe Juma, Roadpacer Transport Limited Co.(Goodnight, F)
February 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Brittany C Taylor . (Carr, Michael)
February 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Roadpacer Transport Limited Co . (Goodnight, F)
February 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ENTRY of Appearance by Brynna Schelbar on behalf of All Defendants (Schelbar, Brynna)
February 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL by All Defendants re #1 Notice of Removal, (Goodnight, F)
February 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by All Defendants. (Goodnight, F)
February 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ENTRY of Appearance by F Jason Goodnight on behalf of All Defendants (Goodnight, F)
February 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ENTRY of Appearance by F Jason Goodnight on behalf of All Defendants (Goodnight, F)
February 10, 2023 Opinion or Order PAYMENT FOR A CIVIL CASE Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AOKWDC-4088814. (Goodnight, F)
February 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Pottawatomie County District Court, case number CJ-2022-292 filed by Thomas Matwetwe Juma, Roadpacer Transport Limited Co. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Petition, #2 Exhibit 2 - AmPetition, #3 Exhibit 3 - JumaSummons, #4 Exhibit 4 - RoadpacerSummons, #5 Exhibit 5 - StCtDkt, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(ekw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Taylor v. Juma et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brittany C Taylor
Represented By: Brian A Williams
Represented By: Michael Eugene Carr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Matwetwe Juma
Represented By: Brynna Schelbar
Represented By: F Jason Goodnight
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roadpacer Transport Limited Co
Represented By: Brynna Schelbar
Represented By: F Jason Goodnight
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?