Proctor v. Stitt et al
Plaintiff: Eric Lee Proctor
Defendant: Kevin Stitt, Oklahoma Pardon and Parole Board and Gentner Drummond
Case Number: 5:2023cv00141
Filed: February 13, 2023
Court: U.S. District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Charles Goodwin
Referring Judge: Gary M Purcell
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 21, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 21, 2023 Filing 8 SUPPLEMENT re #1 Complaint by Eric Lee Proctor. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(naa)
March 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER ADOPTING #6 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION in its entirety. Plaintiff's application for leave to proceed in forma pauperis (Doc. No. #2 ) is DENIED. Plaintiff is advised that unless he pays the $402.00 filing fee in full to the Clerk of the Court on or before April 7, 2023, or shows good cause for his failure to do so, this action shall be subject to dismissal without prejudice. Signed by Judge Charles Goodwin on 03/17/2023. (jb)
February 14, 2023 Filing 6 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION - It is recommended the Application for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis re Doc #2 be DENIED and the action be dismissed without prejudice unless Plaintiff pays the full filing fee to the Clerk of the Court by March 6th, 2023. Objections to R&R due by 3/6/2023. This Report and Recommendation disposes of all issues referred to the undersigned Magistrate Judge in the captioned matter. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gary M. Purcell on 2/14/2023. (cps)
February 14, 2023 Magistrate Judge Gary M. Purcell no longer assigned to case. (cps)
February 13, 2023 Filing 5 ENTER ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Gary M. Purcell. Motions referred to Gary M. Purcell. Signed by the direction of Judge Charles Goodwin on 02/13/2023. (naa)
February 13, 2023 Filing 4 ENTER ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Charles Goodwin for all further proceedings. Judge David L. Russell no longer assigned to case. Signed by the direction of Judge David L. Russell on 02/13/2023. (naa)
February 13, 2023 Filing 3 PREVIOUS Cases (naa)
February 13, 2023 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Eric Lee Proctor. (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1 - Offender Statement Report, #2 Envelope)(naa)
February 13, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Gentner Drummond, Oklahoma Pardon and Parole Board, Kevin Stitt filed by Eric Lee Proctor. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(naa)
February 13, 2023 Notice of Mailing LCvR5.4/Change of Address form, #1 , #4 , #5 to Eric Lee Proctor #229618 HELENA-JCCC 216 N. Murray St. 4E Helena, OK 73741-9606 (naa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Proctor v. Stitt et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric Lee Proctor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin Stitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oklahoma Pardon and Parole Board
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gentner Drummond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?